Global Patent Index - EP 1048744 A1

EP 1048744 A1 2000-11-02 - BEARING STEEL EXCELLENT IN ROLLING FATIGUE LIFE

Title (en)

BEARING STEEL EXCELLENT IN ROLLING FATIGUE LIFE

Title (de)

LAGERSTAHL MIT HERVORRAGENDER WALZERMÜDUNGSBESTÄNDIGKEIT

Title (fr)

ACIER POUR ROULEMENTS PRESENTANT UNE EXCELLENTE RESISTANCE AU ROULEMENT

Publication

EP 1048744 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99951124 A

Priority

  • JP 9905986 W
  • JP 31879598 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a bearing steel which is used as a component for rolling bearings, such as roller bearings and ball bearings, and more particularly, which is used as a component for bearings having superior rolling contact fatigue life. That is, the bearing steel having superior rolling contact fatigue life contains 0.95 to 1.10 mass% of C, more than 1.60 to 3.50 mass% of Cr, 0.0015 mass% or less of O, 0.0010 mass% or less of Sb, and the balance being Fe and incidental impurities. Alternatively, the bearing steel may further contain at least one element selected from the group consisting of 2.5 mass% or less of Si, 2.5 mass% or less of Mn, 2.5 mass% or less of Mo, 3.0 mass% or less of Ni, 1.5 mass% or less of Nb, 1.5 mass% or less of V, 2.0 mass% or less of Cu, and 0.08 mass% or less of Al. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 38/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/18 (2006.01); C22C 38/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/60 (2013.01); C22C 38/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048744 A1 20001102; EP 1048744 A4 20010228; CA 2317658 A1 20000518; JP 2000144326 A 20000526; JP 3779078 B2 20060524; TW 454042 B 20010911; WO 0028100 A1 20000518

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031209

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-12-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: JFE STEEL CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-12-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KOYO SEIKO CO., LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030128

2001-02-28 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20010116

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 22C 38/00 A, 7F 16C 33/62 B

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001113

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE