Global patent index - EP 1048748 A2

EP 1048748 A2 2000-11-02 - Moulded polymer part which can be partially galvanised

Title (en)

Moulded polymer part which can be partially galvanised

Title (de)

Partiell galvanisierbares Polymerenformteil

Title (fr)

Pièce moulée en polymère, adaptée à une galvanisation partielle

Publication

EP 1048748 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00109278 A

Priority

DE 19919709 A

Abstract (en)

The molding consists of two polymers (2, 3). One is, electroplated and the other is not. Polymers are separated by a V-profi An Independent claim is included for the corresponding method. This comprises essentially of successive injection molding i the same mold, to make the component of the two plastics, subsequently electroplating one of them. In a variant a molding is inl before back-injection. Preferred features: The plated part has a tab for connection to electroplating (8) contact clips (5).

Abstract (de)

Ein partiell galvanisierbares Polymerenformteil (1). Das technische Problem ist eine solche Ausbildung des Formteil, daß einzelne Teilbereiche unmittelbar partiell galvanisierbar sind. Die Teilbereiche bestehen aus galvanisierbaren oder nichtgalvanisierbaren Polymeren und sind durch Nuten (7) mit V-Profil voneinander getrennt, wobei die aus galvanisierbaren Polymeren bestehenden Teilbereiche eine galvanische Beschichtung aufweisen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 18/16; C25D 5/02; C25D 5/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 18/16 (2006.01); C25D 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25D 5/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048748 A2 20001102; EP 1048748 A3 20020529; DE 19919709 A1 20010301

INPADOC legal status

2003-10-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021130

2003-03-27 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-02-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-05-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GERHARDI KUNSTSTOFFTECHNIK GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI