Global Patent Index - EP 1048751 A1

EP 1048751 A1 2000-11-02 - Method for adhering a hard coating to a substrate and coated substrate

Title (en)

Method for adhering a hard coating to a substrate and coated substrate

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Aufbringen einer harten Beschichtung auf einen Gegenstand und beschichteter Gegenstand

Title (fr)

Procédé pour appliquer un revêtement dur sur un substrat et substrat revêtu

Publication

EP 1048751 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00810336 A

Priority

CH 79099 A

Abstract (en)

The surface (5) of the object (3) is pretreated, to receive the coating (1) containing distributed diamond crystals. An Independent claim is included for the high thermal conductivity-, especially aluminum, object so coated.

Abstract (de)

Es wird auf einem metallischen, eine hohe Wärmeleitfähigkeit aufweisenden Gegenstand eine insbesondere antihaftenden Beschichtung (1) mit eingelagerten Diamantkristallen aufgebracht. Der Gegenstand (3) ist bevorzugt als Küchengerät zum Braten, Backen etc. sowie bei anderen Gelegenheiten verwendbar, bei denen eine gleichmäßige Erwärmung über einen möglichst großen Flächenbereich gewünscht bzw. gefordert ist. Der Gegenstand (3) selbst besteht vorzugsweise im wesentlichen aus Aluminium oder einer Aluminiumlegierung, kann aber auch aus Stahl oder Eisen oder Kupfer bestehen. Die Diamantkristalle enthaltende Beschichtung (1) wird auf eine vorbehandelte Oberfläche des Gegenstands (3) aufgebracht. Die Beschichtung (1) ist vorzugsweise eine Hartschicht, welche eine Aluminiumoxid/Titandioxid-Mischschicht sein kann. Auf die unmittelbar auf dem Gegenstand liegende Beschichtung (1) kann eine weitere, vorzugsweise eingefärbte Antihaftschicht (9) und über dieser eine Deckschicht (11) aufgebracht werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 30/00; A47J 36/02; B05D 5/08; C23C 4/02; C23C 4/04; C23C 4/10; C23C 28/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 4/02 (2006.01); C23C 4/04 (2006.01); C23C 4/10 (2006.01); C23C 28/00 (2006.01); C23C 30/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 30/00 (2013.01); C23C 4/02 (2013.01); C23C 4/04 (2013.01); C23C 4/10 (2013.01); C23C 28/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] GB 1095564 A
  • [A] US 5633086 A 19970527 - HSU STEPHEN M [US], et al
  • [A] US 5545255 A 19960813 - OGAWA KAZUFUMI [JP]
  • [A] US 5260141 A 19931109 - TSAI CHUNG-HSIEN [US], et al
  • [A] US 4735925 A 19880405 - KATO TAKASHI [JP], et al
  • [A] EP 0373377 A1 19900620 - ENKE KNUT
  • [A] EP 0331155 A2 19890906 - SCHOLL HARALD [DE], et al
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 11 29 November 1996 (1996-11-29)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 06 31 July 1995 (1995-07-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 009, no. 017 (C - 262) 24 January 1985 (1985-01-24)
  • [A] RAMESHAM R ET AL: "SELECTIVE DIAMOND SEED DEPOSITION USING ELECTROPLATED COPPER", DIAMOND AND RELATED MATERIALS,NL,ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, vol. 1, no. 8, 25 June 1992 (1992-06-25), pages 907 - 910, XP000349652, ISSN: 0925-9635
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 08 30 August 1996 (1996-08-30)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 03 31 March 1997 (1997-03-31)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048751 A1 20001102; EP 1048751 B1 20041027; AT 280850 T 20041115; DE 50008380 D1 20041202

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160411

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-02-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160310

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160310

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160623

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160314

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-03-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2016-02-29 [PGRI FR] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Effective date: 20151202

2015-04-24 [REG FR FC] FAVOURABLE DECISION OF INPI DIRECTOR GENERAL ON AN APPLICATION FOR RESTAURATION.

- Effective date: 20150324

2015-04-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-10 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

- Effective date: 20150311

2015-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140418

2015-01-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141231

2014-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 280850 T

- Effective date: 20140418

2014-05-02 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20140402

2014-05-02 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: SWISS DIAMOND INTERNATIONAL SA

- Effective date: 20140402

2014-04-30 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SWISS DIAMOND INTERNATIONAL SA, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HORT COATING CENTER, SIERRE, CH

- Document: DE 50008380

- Effective date: 20140320

2014-04-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50008380

- Representative's name: OTTEN, ROTH, DOBLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20140320

2014-04-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50008380

- Representative's name: OTTEN, ROTH, DOBLER & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAEL, DE

- Effective date: 20140320

2014-03-14 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SWISS DIAMOND INTERNATIONAL SA, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HORT COATING CENTER, CH

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120330

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070418

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050327

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HORT COATING CENTER

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: HORT COATING CENTER

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-10-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050728

2005-09-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-18 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-05-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-18 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050418

2005-04-18 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050418

2005-04-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050310

2005-02-07 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050207

2005-01-27 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050127

2005-01-27 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050127

2005-01-27 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050127

2005-01-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2004-12-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008380 P 20041202

2004-12-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-10-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-10-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-10-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041027

2004-10-27 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041027

2004-10-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041027

2004-10-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HORT, STEFAN

2004-04-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 23C 30/00 A

2004-04-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 23C 28/00 B

2004-04-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 23C 4/02 B

2004-04-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 23C 4/04 B

2004-04-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 23C 4/10 B

2004-04-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 47J 36/02 B

2004-04-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 05D 5/08 B

2004-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 23C 30/00 A

2004-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 23C 28/00 B

2004-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 23C 4/02 B

2004-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 23C 4/04 B

2004-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 23C 4/10 B

2004-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 47J 36/02 B

2004-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 05D 5/08 B

2004-03-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HORT COATING CENTER

2003-01-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021216

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010301

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI