Global Patent Index - EP 1048760 A1

EP 1048760 A1 2000-11-02 - Production process of multisegmented filaments or fibres, and resulting filaments or fibres and textile surfaces

Title (en)

Production process of multisegmented filaments or fibres, and resulting filaments or fibres and textile surfaces

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von multisegmentierten Flächen oder Fasern sowie von daraus resultierenden Fäden oder Fasern und textilen Oberflächen

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication de filaments ou de fibres multisegmenté(e)s, ainsi que filaments ou fibres et surfaces textiles résultants

Publication

EP 1048760 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00103290 A

Priority

FR 9902663 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2790487A1] Polymer material(s) (1) forced through separate orifices (On, Om) of a spinneret or extrusion die, produce two or more elementary filaments (3). Orifices occupy one or more groups. Filaments from a group are assembled by prompt adhesion, on contact. A resultant, single-filament assembly (4), has a multi-segment cross section in which mixing of phases is limited or non-existent. Filaments are consolidated and stretched before further treatment and manipulation, which will produce: fibers, reels of filaments, cords or nonwoven cloth produced in a direct route. An Independent claim is included for the spinneret or orifice plate used and constructed in accordance with the claimed method. In addition, multisegment filament or fiber as described, is claimed. A further claim concerns nonwoven fabric, produced by direct fabrication in accordance with the claims. Preferred features: Extrudate emerges from orifices as a bulb-shapes (Bn, Bm). Bulbs contact. Arithmetic relationships are provided for suitable hole diameters and their relative arrangements in accordance with the foregoing provisions. The shape of sections, their dimensions and dispositions relative to the spinning orifices of the same group, are determined from the corresponding parameters and other properties of the multisegment and/or composite product (4) itself. Orifices of a group, are fed the same polymer, or by different polymers. Adherent contact between filaments from adjacent orifices of a group is differentiated continuously or intermittently. Bulb shape is varied for differentiation or shift in adherent contact. A dependent claim is included for a nonwoven textile, in which the multisegment fibers are treated physically or chemically to separate them, at least in part, into the elementary filaments first produced.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung hat zum Gegenstand ein Verfahren zur Herstellung von multisegmentierten Fäden oder Fasern und/oder zusammengesetzten Strukturen, sowie dadurch gewonnener Fäden oder Fasern und einer textilen Oberfläche. Verfahren, das dadurch gekennzeichnet ist, daß es darin besteht, das polymere Material oder die polymeren Materialien (1, 1') unter angepassten rheologischen Bedingungen in eine Spinndüse (2) zu leiten, sodann dieses Polymer oder diese Polymere durch Filierungs- oder Extrusionsöffnungen (On, Om) zu extrudieren, die voneinander getrennt, aber in einer Gruppierung oder in mehreren Gruppierungen angeordnet sind, um einen Satz oder mehrere Sätze von mindestens zwei Elementarfäden (3, 3') zu formen, und sodann von diesen durch Adhäsionskontakt die verschiedenen aus jeder Gruppierung (G) der Öffnungen (On, Om) herausquellenden Elementarfäden (3, 3') in einen Faden (4) mit multisegmentiertem Querschnitt pro Gruppierung bei begrenzter oder inexistenter Phasenmelange zu vereinigen und schließlich die resultierenden Fäden (4) zu konsolidieren und zu strecken, bevor sie ihrer nachfolgenden Bearbeitung und/oder Behandlung, insbesondere zum Zweck der Herstellung von z. B. Fasern, Fadenspulen, Kabel oder nichtgewebter Vliese auf direktem Weg zugeführt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01D 5/32; D01D 5/24; D01D 5/253; D04H 1/42; D04H 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01D 5/30 (2006.01); D01D 5/24 (2006.01); D01D 5/253 (2006.01); D01D 5/32 (2006.01); D04H 3/016 (2012.01); D04H 3/018 (2012.01); D04H 3/10 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 3/016 (2013.01); D01D 5/24 (2013.01); D01D 5/253 (2013.01); D01D 5/32 (2013.01); D04H 3/018 (2013.01); D04H 3/10 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

FR 7420254 A 19740610

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2790487 A1 20000908; FR 2790487 B1 20010420; BR 0000719 A 20010130; CA 2300583 A1 20000902; CA 2300583 C 20040113; CN 1233893 C 20051228; CN 1265435 A 20000906; EP 1048760 A1 20001102; JP 2000248420 A 20000912; TW 592221 U 20040611; ZA 200001006 B 20011129

INPADOC legal status


2011-01-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100805

2010-04-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GROTEN, ROBERT, DR.

2010-04-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BARAVIAN, JEAN

2010-04-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RIBOULET, GEORGES

2006-10-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060912

2002-01-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CARL FREUDENBERG KG

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000915

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI