Global Patent Index - EP 1048762 A3

EP 1048762 A3 2001-01-17 - Drive device for driving draft rollers in spinning machine

Title (en)

Drive device for driving draft rollers in spinning machine

Title (de)

Antriebseinrichtung zum Antreiben von Streckwalzen in einer Spinnmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'entrainement pour entrainener des rouleaux d'étirage dans un métier à filer

Publication

EP 1048762 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00108039 A

Priority

JP 11596699 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1048762A2] Spinning machine includes draft rollers 3, 4 and 5 and a drive device for driving the draft rollers. The drive device has a drive unit 6 for driving the front draft roller 5, and a drive unit 7 for driving the back and middle draft rollers 3 and 4. Each drive unit has a variable speed motor M2 or M3 and a transmission mechanism, and the variable speed motor of the drive unit 6 for driving the front draft roller 5 is a synchronous AC motor having permanent magnets. A reverse rotation preventing device including a ratchet wheel and a pawl is arranged in the drive unit 6 for preventing a reverse rotation of the front draft roller 5, occurring with a reverse rotation of the synchronous motor M2, caused by the action of the permanent magnets in the synchronous motor upon starting the synchronous motor. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 1/22; D01H 5/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/22 (2006.01); D01H 1/30 (2006.01); D01H 5/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 5/32 (2013.01); D01H 1/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048762 A2 20001102; EP 1048762 A3 20010117; CN 1273287 A 20001115; JP 2000303269 A 20001031

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020317

2002-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011206

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE IT LI

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010509

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7D 01H 1/22 A, 7D 01H 5/32 B

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI