Global Patent Index - EP 1048764 A3

EP 1048764 A3 2000-11-22 - Continuous filament yarn with pixel color effect

Title (en)

Continuous filament yarn with pixel color effect

Title (de)

Endlosfilament-Faden mit farbigem Pixelergebnis

Title (fr)

Fil constitué de filaments continus donnant un effet de pixel coloré

Publication

EP 1048764 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00115617 A

Priority

  • EP 97102288 A
  • US 62219696 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0798409A1] Multiple (at least two) differently colored or colorable feed yarns are fed from their respective yarn packages to a multi-position interlacer manifold assembly. The feed yarns are maintained separate and apart from one another and are passed in this separated state through individual interlacer jets associated with the interlacer manifold assembly. The individual yarns are thereafter conveyed to a conventional yarn processing system (e.g., an apparatus known colloquially in the art as a "Gilbos" apparatus) where they are entangled with one another to provide a finished yarn in which the individual yarn components remain substantially coherent throughout the finished yarn. The individual interlaced yarns thus become entangled with one another when subjected to the yarn processing system without substantial inter-yarn blending or commingling occurring (which blending or commingling would thereby cause the constituent yarns to become nearly indistinguishable from one another). That is, each of the interlaced feed yarns will retain substantially its individual coherent identity in the final entangled yarn product so that its associated color is capable of being visually perceived along the length of the yarn -- i.e., as color "pixels" in the yarn.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02J 1/08; D02G 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D02G 1/16 (2006.01); D02J 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02G 3/346 (2013.01); D02G 1/161 (2013.01); D02G 1/165 (2013.01); D02J 1/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0798409 A1 19971001; EP 0798409 B1 20020123; AU 1641397 A 19971002; AU 715656 B2 20000210; CA 2194601 A1 19970926; CA 2194601 C 20030729; DE 69709972 D1 20020314; DE 69709972 T2 20020829; DE 69736817 D1 20061123; DE 69736817 T2 20070809; EP 1048764 A2 20001102; EP 1048764 A3 20001122; EP 1048764 B1 20061011; US 5715584 A 19980210

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110213

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100213

2011-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2010-11-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20101029

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100213

2010-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2010-09-15 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20100901

2010-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100220

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090206

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090318

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090122

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090106

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090227

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-05-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090210

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-09-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070712

2007-05-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-11-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69736817

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-11-23

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2006-10-11 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 0798409

- Country of Ref Document: EP

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2006-06-07 [18RA] DATE OF RECEIPT OF REQUEST FOR RE-ESTABLISHMENT OF RIGHTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18RA

- Effective date: 20060413

2006-03-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050905

2005-03-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-09-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030812

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-11-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: COONS, ANDREW M. III

2000-11-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KING, WILLIS M.

2000-11-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: THOMPSON, MELVIN R.

2000-11-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: VICKERY, LEONARD C., JR.

2000-11-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WOLSTENHOLME, IAN

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000720

2000-11-02 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 798409

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL