Global Patent Index - EP 1048766 A2

EP 1048766 A2 2000-11-02 - Process for inserting weft in a linear shed multiphase loom

Title (en)

Process for inserting weft in a linear shed multiphase loom

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Eintragen eines Schussfadens in eine Reihenfachwebmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé pour insérer le fil de trame dans un métier multiphasé à foule linéaire

Publication

EP 1048766 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00810242 A

Priority

  • EP 00810242 A
  • EP 99810332 A

Abstract (en)

To insert weft yarns into the successive sheds of a rolling shed loom, formed by a loom rotor (4), a weft (10a-10d) is inser into the passage (2a-2d), at the rotor, by a fixed feed. The weft for insertion is cut (25) at the leading end to form a new wef insertion point. The weft is retracted (32) from the rotor until the weft point (33b) is in the feed or near the feed outlet opening, and is then inserted into a new passage of the rotating rotor. The retracted weft section is temporarily stored in the feed, as a yarn loop (32b). The weft is retracted by a fluid flow and/or a mechanical action on the weft. The weft is passed continuously into the feed unit and, if required, is stored temporarily, to held by a controlled fluid flow and/or a direct mechanical action on the yarn. The weft insertion into a passage at the rotor is synchronized. When the entry opening of the rotor passage at the rotor is aligned with the weft point, the weft is inserted.

Abstract (de)

Beim Verfahren zum Eintragen eines Schussfadens in einen eine Mehrzahl von Schusseintragsstrecken aufweisenden Webrotor einer Reihenfachwebmaschine wird ein Schussfaden über eine feststehende Zuführvorrichtung in eine der Schusseintragsstrecken des rotierenden Webrotors eingetragen wird, der eingetragene Schussfaden schusseintragsseitig geschnitten und dadurch am Schussfaden eine neue Schussfadenspitze erzeugt, wobei der Schussfaden mittels der Zuführvorrichtung aus dem Webrotor zurückgezogen wird bis sich die Schussfadenspitze in der Zuführvorrichtung oder im Bereich der Austrittsöffnung der Zuführvorrichtung befindet, und wobei der Schussfaden daraufhin in eine weitere Schusseintragsstrecke des rotierenden Webrotors eingetragen wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 41/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 41/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 41/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048766 A2 20001102; EP 1048766 A3 20010606

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031002

2002-02-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE IT

2002-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011109

2001-06-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI