Global Patent Index - EP 1048767 A2

EP 1048767 A2 2000-11-02 - Linear shed multiphase loom and process for inserting weft in a linear shed multiphase loom

Title (en)

Linear shed multiphase loom and process for inserting weft in a linear shed multiphase loom

Title (de)

Reihenfachwebmaschine und Verfahren zum Eintrag eines Schussfadens in eine Reihenfachwebmaschine

Title (fr)

Métier à tisser multiphasé à foule linéaire et procédé pour insérer le fil de trame dans un métier à tisser multiphasé à foule linéaire

Publication

EP 1048767 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00810243 A

Priority

  • EP 00810243 A
  • EP 99810333 A

Abstract (en)

The rolling shed loom has a rotor (4) rotating round an axis (D), with a number of weft channels (7a-7d) each with an entry opening (2a-2d) at the end side (4b) of the rotor. The channels (7a-7d) are equidistant round the rotor circumference along the line. A fixed weft feed delivers the wefts (10a-10d), with a guide (18a-18d) for each weft, with the guide outlets (23a-23d) ali at the entry openings at the end side of the rotor. The rotor (4) is rotated so that each channel entry opening (2a-2d) is temporarily halted in alignment with the outlet openings (23a-23d) of the weft feed guides (18a,18d). The weft feed has a retraction unit to withdraw a cut weft (10a-10d) at least from the rotor (4). A feed jet (13a-13d) is a the weft entry side of the rotor (4) for each channel (2) which, at the same time, form the entry openings (2a-2d). A yarn guide sec is between the weft feed and the rotor (4), fitted to the end side (4b) of the rotor (4). The guide has a number of grooves to c the wefts, each at an entry opening (2a-2d) where pref. each groove is deployed with three equidistant entry openings (2a-2d). T other guide section is fixed opposite the end side (4b) of the rotor (4), with a slitted guide channel, where the slit is aligne the end side (4b) of the rotor (4). An Independent claim is included for the insertion of wefts into a rolling shed loom, where wefts (10a-10d) move at the feed along the axis line of the rotor (4) to an end side (4b) of it. The wefts are inserted into the rotor channels (2) at time intervals as they are aligned with the weft transfer path for them to be inserted into the channels f the feed, in succession with the rotor rotation. Preferred Features: During a full weft insertion, they are advanced to the end (4b) of the rotor (4) in its direction of rotation (5). On a successful insertion, the leading ends of the wefts are cut to form new weft point. The wefts are retracted by the feed so that the weft point is within the feed or near the feed outlet openings (23a-23d). After insertion and cutting, the wefts are passed in a loop into the weft insertion stretch (2).

Abstract (de)

Die Reihenfachwebmaschine umfasst einen um eine Drehachse (D) drehbar gelagerten Webrotor (4) mit mehreren, je eine Eintrittsöffnung (2a, 2b, 2c, 2d) und einen Schusskanal (7a, 7b, 7c, 7d) umfassende Schusseintragsstrecken (2), wobei die Schusskanäle (7a, 7b, 7c, 7d) in Umfangsrichtung des Webrotors (4) regelmässig beabstandet und in Richtung (D1) der Drehachse (D) verlaufenden angeordnet sind, und wobei die Eintrittsöffnungen (2a, 2b, 2c, 2d) im Bereich einer Stirnseite (4b) des Webrotors (4) angeordnet sind. Weiter umfasst die Reihenfachwebmaschine eine feststehende Zuführvorrichtung (18) für Schussfäden (10a, 10b, 10c, 10d), wobei die Zuführvorrichtung (18) für jeden Schussfaden (10a, 10b, 10c, 10d) ein Leitelement (18a, 18b, 18c, 18d) mit einem Austritt (23a, 23b, 23c, 23d) aufweist, und die Leitelemente (18a, 18b, 18c, 18d) derart verlaufend und die Austritte (23a, 23b, 23c, 23d) derart zur Stirnseite (4b) des Webrotors (4) ausgerichtet angeordnet sind, dass der Schussfaden (10a, 10b, 10c, 10d) im wesentlichen in Richtung (D1) der Drehachse (D) verlaufend aus dem Leitelement (18a, 18b, 18c, 18d) austritt und dabei derart zur Eintrittsöffnung (2a, 2b, 2c, 2d) hin ausgerichtet ist, dass bei sich drehendem Webrotor (4) die Eintrittsöffnung (2a, 2b, 2c, 2d) jeweils kurzfristig im wesentlichen gegenüberliegend der Austritte (23a, 23b, 23c, 23d) angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 41/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 41/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 41/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048767 A2 20001102; EP 1048767 A3 20010530; EP 1048767 B1 20060517

INPADOC legal status


2010-02-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SULTEX A.G.

- Effective date: 20090331

2008-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080430

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080321

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070220

2006-06-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50012744 P 20060622

2006-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

2006-05-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060517

2003-03-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SULTEX AG

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE IT

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011102

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI