Global patent index - EP 1048770 A1

EP 1048770 A1 2000-11-02 - Latch needle with a latch mounted on a pivot bearing

Title (en)

Latch needle with a latch mounted on a pivot bearing

Title (de)

Zungennadel mit auf einem Zapfen gelagerter Zunge

Title (fr)

Aiguille à clapet avec un clapet monté sur un pivot à articulation

Publication

EP 1048770 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00105150 A

Priority

DE 19914928 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19914928A1] The latch needle (1) has a recess (24), where the base (26) forms a further recess (20) at the outer zone (28). The recess (24) has a generally cylindrical wall (25). The further recess (20) at the recess base (26) is at a ring-shaped outer zone (28). The recess (24) has a center section (27), and the additional recess (20) is deeper than the center (27). The second recess (20) is in a coherent structure with the main recessed zone (24). The center zone (27) of the recess (24) is flat or it is cambered. The recess has a step transit between the center section (27) and the additional recess (20), with a conical ring surface. The width of the additional recess (20) is greater than its depth, as a ring groove with a groove base, mantle surfaces and groove flanks. A cambered transit surface is between the groove base into the groove mantle surfaces and the flanks, with a curve radius which is less than half the groove width, or one-third or pref. one-quarter of the groove width. The needle recess (24) has a depth at the center section (27) equal to the height of the projections (11,12). The latch mounting (13) is formed by the two projections (11,12), each secured to a cheek (8,9) of the needle structure. The projections (11,12) give a cylindrical mantle surface (15), and a laying surface for the latch (5). The projections (11,12) have flat end surfaces (17,18) towards each other, pref. with contact, parallel to the cheeks (8,9) and forming an included angle with the cheeks which differs from zero. The second recess (20) is at a zone for the edges of the latch opening (14).

Abstract (de)

Eine Zungennadel weist zur Lagerung ihrer Zunge Halbzapfen (11, 12) auf, die an der Zungennadel angeformt sind. Die Zungennadel (1) ist dazu mit einem Zungenschlitz (7) versehen, der von zwei Wangen (8, 9) begrenzt wird. An den voneinander weg weisenden Seitenflächen der Wangen (8, 9) sind Vertiefungen ausgebildet. Die durch plastische Verformung gebildeten Vertiefungen erzeugen Vorsprünge bzw. Halbzapfen (11 und 12), welche in den Zungenschlitz (7) und in das Zungenloch einer sich in den Zungenschlitz (7) erstreckenden Zunge (5) ragen. Der Boden der Vertiefung (24) weist in seinem Randbereich in axialer Verlängerung eine weitere Vertiefung (20) auf. Diese Form der zweifach gestuften Vertiefung ermöglicht die Ausbildung eines relativ präzise zylindrischen Halbzapfens (11, 12), so dass der Traganteil der durch die beiden Halbzapfen (11, 12) festgelegten Lagerfläche (15) maximiert wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 35/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 35/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 35/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19914928 A1 20001005; DE 19914928 C2 20010523; EP 1048770 A1 20001102; EP 1048770 B1 20040728; ES 2220278 T3 20041216; JP 2000303332 A 20001031; US 6209360 B1 20010403

INPADOC legal status

2014-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130311

2014-06-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20140606

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130310

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130310

2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130402

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-23 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50007170

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20131001

2013-12-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20131129

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130310

2013-06-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120327

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120330

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120322

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120331

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120403

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-07-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050429

2005-01-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2220278

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-09-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50007170

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-09-02

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-08-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040728

2004-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-07-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030217

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001124

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI