Global patent index - EP 1048773 A3

EP 1048773 A3 2001-04-18 - Support for winding yarn

Title (en)

Support for winding yarn

Title (de)

Wickelträger zur Aufnahme von Garn

Title (fr)

Support pour enroulement de fil textile

Publication

EP 1048773 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00107560 A

Priority

DE 19917767 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1048773A2] The bobbin sleeve, to take a wound yarn, has a running ring (15) which is pushed into the holder (11) by the additional coll (10), to be bonded with the sleeve (1). When pushed into place, the running ring (15) is flush with the end side of the bobbin sleeve (1). The running ring (15) is pushed home until an end side is against a limit surface of the opening (11). The running ring (15) is in a clamped fit on the additional collar (10). The outer dial. of the running ring (15) is larger than the inner dia. of the opening (11). The outer ma of the running ring (15) has a roughened surface, with peripheral and parallel grooves.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06B 23/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 75/18 (2006.01); D06B 23/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06B 23/042 (2013.01); B65H 75/185 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048773 A2 20001102; EP 1048773 A3 20010418; EP 1048773 B1 20030709; DE 19917767 C1 20010118; TR 200001008 A2 20001121; TR 200001008 A3 20001121

INPADOC legal status

2013-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-01-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20121228

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110426

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-06-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-05-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FR

2002-02-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: FR

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011001

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FR

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI