Global patent index - EP 1048781 A2

EP 1048781 A2 2000-11-02 - Cooling system for a paper or board machine

Title (en)

Cooling system for a paper or board machine

Title (de)

Kühlsystem für eine Papier- oder Kartonmaschine

Title (fr)

Système de refroidissement pour une machine à papier ou carton

Publication

EP 1048781 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00102934 A

Priority

DE 19919877 A

Abstract (en)

The cooling system for a papermaking or cardboard prodn. machine has at least one closed primary cooling circuit (3.1-3.4;4.1-4.4) to take off surplus heat. Each primary circuit has at least one primary fluid/water heat exchanger (2.1-2.4) t transfer heat to at least one closed secondary cooling circuit (5,6). The secondary cooling circuit has at least one secondary water/water heat exchanger (8) to transfer heat from the secondary to a tertiary coolant water strand with a coolant water feed and outlet (10) at the papermaking/cardboard prodn. machine. The primary cooling circuit (3.1-3.4;4.1-4.4) uses oil as a heat carrier. The tertiary cooling circuit passes through a coo tower, where excess heat is released into the ambient environment. The tertiary cooling circuit has a collection vessel where coolant water is fed to the cooling tower and the preparation process if required. The tertiary cooling circuit has an intermedi vessel between the cooling tower and the secondary heat exchanger (8).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Kühlsystem zur Abführung überschüssiger Prozeß- und/oder Maschinenwärme aus einer Papier- oder Kartonmaschine mit: mindestens einem geschlossenen primären Kühlkreislauf (3.1, 4.1; 3.2, 4.2; 3.3, 4.3; 3.4, 4.4), welcher überschüssige Wärme ableitet, je Primärkreislauf (3.1, 4.1; 3.2, 4.2; 3.3, 4.3; 3.4, 4.4) mindestens einem primären Fluid/Wasser-Wärmetauscher (2.1 - 2.4) zur Übertragung der Wärme auf mindestens einen geschlossenen sekundären Kühlkreislauf (5, 6) (Sekundärkreislauf), und im sekundären Kühlkreislauf (5, 6) mindestens einem sekundären Wasser/Wasser-Wärmetauscher (8), zur Übertragung der Wärme des sekundären Kühlkreislaufes (5, 6) (Sekundärkreislaufes) an einen tertiären Kühlwasserstrang mit Kühlwasservorlauf (9) und Kühlwasserablauf (10) der Papier- oder Kartonmaschine. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 5/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/20 (2006.01); D21G 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/20 (2013.01); D21G 1/0253 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048781 A2 20001102; EP 1048781 A3 20010328; EP 1048781 B1 20051109; AT 309409 T 20051115; DE 19919877 A1 20001102; DE 50011538 D1 20051215; US 6293113 B1 20010925

INPADOC legal status

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-12-04 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50011538

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140214

2014-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140214

2014-10-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 309409

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20140214

2014-09-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50011538

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-06-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130213

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130219

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130213

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120215

2011-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110214

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-10-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060810

2006-09-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2006-02-28 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2005-12-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50011538

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-12-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-11-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE FI SE

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010928

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7D 21F 5/20 A, 7D 21G 1/02 B

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI