Global Patent Index - EP 1048782 A1

EP 1048782 A1 2000-11-02 - Soft roll and process for making such a roll

Title (en)

Soft roll and process for making such a roll

Title (de)

Elastische Walze und Verfahren zum Herstellen einer solchen

Title (fr)

Rouleau élastique et procédé pour la fabrication d' un tel rouleau

Publication

EP 1048782 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00105584 A

Priority

DE 19919569 A

Abstract (en)

The calender roller, to polish the surface of a paper web, has a hard metal core (1) and an elastic outer cladding (2). The cladding (2) is composed of a matrix material (3) with filling materials (6,7) at least partially of longitudinally-drawn and especially rod-shaped particles (6), with a length which is less than the radial thickness of the elastic cladding (2). The particles have a length:thickness ratio of 20:1 to 5:1 and especially 15:1 to 7:1 and pref. 10:1 and/or they are in a statistical distribution radially and/or axially in the matrix material (3). The majority of the particles (6) are on a radial alignment in the matrix (3) or they are in a statistical alignment distribution. The particles (6) are of a heat conductive mate with a thermal conductivity which is higher than the material of the matrix (3) and/or part of the particles (6) extend radially inwards to the surface (9) of the metal core (1) and/or the particles (6) have a thermal expansion coefficient which is lower th the matrix (3). The particles (6) are stiffer than the matrix material (3) and/or part of the particles (6) extends radially outwards to the outer surface (8) of the elastic cladding (2) and/or the particles (6) have an average length of 200-600 mu m an especially 300-500 mu m and pref. 400 mu m and/or the particles (6) are of wollastonite and/or calcium silicate. Fibers (4) of g and/or carbon are embedded in the matrix (3), in addition to the particles (6), in a fiber layer (5) or in radially successive f layers spaced apart or against each other. The elastic cladding (2) contains 5-100 fiber layers (5), and especially 20-70 layers pref. 30-40 layers and/or the particles are between the separate fiber layers (5). The cladding has an outer functional layer an inner bonding layer, to bond it to the roller core. The particles are mainly in the functional layer. The matrix material (3) is heat-setting or thermoplastic and/or is a combined resin/hardener. An Independent claim is included for the prodn. of a cladded roller where the elastic matrix material is augmented by longitudinally drawn and especially rod-shaped particles, with a shorte length than the radial thickness of the cladding. Fibers are also added to the matrix material. Preferred Features: To produce t cladding layer, at least one bundle of a number of fibers is wound round the roller core in a number of overlaid layers. The particles are added between the wound fiber layers and/or between the fiber layer and the roller core surface and/or between the fiber layer and the outer cladding surface. The fiber bundle is formed by one or more fiber rovings and/or a fiber web. The rovi is composed of a number of adjacent fibers of the same type and/or the fiber bundle is formed by a web. Before winding, the fibe bundle is coated with a matrix material, especially through a bath which contains the particles in the bath, and the saturated bundle is wound round the core. Or the fiber bundle is dry, on winding round the roller core, and is treated with the matrix material during or after winding so that the fibers are wholly embedded in the matrix.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Walze, insbesondere zum Glätten von Papierbahnen, beschrieben, wobei die Walze einen insbesondere aus Metall bestehenden harten Walzenkern (1) umfaßt, der an seiner Außenseite mit einer elastischen Bezugsschicht (2) versehen ist. Die Bezugsschicht besteht aus einem elastischen Matrixmaterial (3) und in das Matrixmaterial eingebetteten Füllstoffen (6,7). Zumindest ein Teil der Füllstoffe (6,7) ist als langgestreckte, insbesondere stäbchenförmige Teilchen (6) ausgebildet, wobei die Länge der Teilchen (6) kleiner als die radiale Dicke der elastischen Bezugsschicht (2) ist. Weiterhin wird ein Verfahren zum Herstellen einer solchen Walze beschrieben. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21G 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/0233 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048782 A1 20001102; EP 1048782 B1 20031210; DE 19919569 A1 20001102; DE 19919569 B4 20110707; US 6428455 B1 20020806

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50004692

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20131001

2013-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130316

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120402

2012-12-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20121130

2012-06-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120313

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120323

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110404

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060314

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-11-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2007-03-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070317

2006-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060316

2006-03-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060316

2005-03-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050307

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-12-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040913

2004-07-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-05-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040408

2004-03-30 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-01-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50004692

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-01-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB SE

2003-12-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021112

2001-08-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FI FR GB SE

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001208

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI