Global patent index - EP 1048787 A2

EP 1048787 A2 2000-11-02 - Apparatus and method for repairing or replacing parts of bituminous road coverings

Title (en)

Apparatus and method for repairing or replacing parts of bituminous road coverings

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Reperatur oder zum Ersetzen von Teilen einer bituminösen Strassendecke

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour la réparation ou le remplacement des éléments de revêtements en enrobés bitumineux

Publication

EP 1048787 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00108717 A

Priority

DE 19919025 A

Abstract (en)

The road surface repair or replacement method has an opening formed in the existing bituminous road surface, e.g. via a mate removal head (18), before inserting a bituminous element in the opening, which is spread out at its inner and/or outer periphery for matching the opening contour, with subsequent hardening of the bituminous element. Also included are Independent claims for the following: (a) an application of a road surface repair or replacement method for replacement or lifting of gas water, or hydrant acces shaft covers; (b) a device for repair or replacement of a bituminous road surface

Abstract (de)

Ein Verfahren zur Reparatur oder zum Ersetzen von Teilen einer bituminösen Straßendecke weist folgende Verfahrensschritte auf: Herstellung einer Ausnehmung in der Straßendecke, Einsetzen eines Bauelementes aus bituminösen Material in die Ausnehmung, Erweichen von wenigstens Teilen der Oberfläche der Innen- und/oder Außenkontur der Bauelemente, Einpassen der Bauelemente in die Ausnehmung und Aushärten lassen der zuvor erweichten Innen- und/oder Außenkontur. Eine Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens weist einen an einem Fahrzeug anbringbaren Auslegerarm 3 auf, an dem eine Längsführungsschiene 4 fest montiert ist, entlang der ein Längspositionierschlitten 6 verfahrbar ist, ferner eine an dem Längspositionierschlitten 6 fest angeordnete Querführungsschiene 8, auf der ein Querpositionierschlitten 10 verfahrbar angeordnet ist, an welchem ein Zentrierschlitten 12 vertikal verfahrbar geführt ist, sowie einen an dem Zentrierschlitten 12 um 360° drehbar ausgebildeten Fräseraufnahmearm 14, welcher einen Fräserantrieb 16 aufweist, welcher einen auswechselbaren Fräskopf 18 aufnimmt und antreibt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 23/06; E01C 23/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 11/00 (2006.01); E01C 23/06 (2006.01); E01C 23/09 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 23/094 (2013.01); E01C 11/005 (2013.01); E01C 23/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048787 A2 20001102; EP 1048787 A3 20011219; DE 19919025 A1 20001102

INPADOC legal status

2004-05-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031101

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT NL

2002-08-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020615

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI