Global Patent Index - EP 1048787 A3

EP 1048787 A3 2001-12-19 - Apparatus and method for repairing or replacing parts of bituminous road coverings

Title (en)

Apparatus and method for repairing or replacing parts of bituminous road coverings

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Reperatur oder zum Ersetzen von Teilen einer bituminösen Strassendecke

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour la réparation ou le remplacement des éléments de revêtements en enrobés bitumineux

Publication

EP 1048787 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00108717 A

Priority

DE 19919025 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1048787A2] The road surface repair or replacement method has an opening formed in the existing bituminous road surface, e.g. via a mate removal head (18), before inserting a bituminous element in the opening, which is spread out at its inner and/or outer periphery for matching the opening contour, with subsequent hardening of the bituminous element. Also included are Independent claims for the following: (a) an application of a road surface repair or replacement method for replacement or lifting of gas water, or hydrant acces shaft covers; (b) a device for repair or replacement of a bituminous road surface

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 23/06; E01C 23/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 11/00 (2006.01); E01C 23/06 (2006.01); E01C 23/09 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 23/094 (2013.01); E01C 11/005 (2013.01); E01C 23/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048787 A2 20001102; EP 1048787 A3 20011219; DE 19919025 A1 20001102

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031101

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL

2002-08-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020615

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI