Global Patent Index - EP 1048793 A1

EP 1048793 A1 2000-11-02 - Apparatus for removal of sediment

Title (en)

Apparatus for removal of sediment

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Entfernen von Sediment

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'enlèvement de sédiment

Publication

EP 1048793 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00303347 A

Priority

GB 9909457 A

Abstract (en)

There is provided sediment removal apparatus 1 for removal of sediment from pipes 2 in a water distribution system, comprising an elongate extendible member 3 adapted to extend under fluid pressure through bends and direction changes in pipework, the member defining a conduit 4 for fluid flow.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03B 7/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 9/04 (2006.01); B65H 75/34 (2006.01); B65H 75/44 (2006.01); E03B 7/09 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03B 7/006 (2013.01); B08B 9/04 (2013.01); B65H 75/38 (2013.01); B65H 75/4471 (2013.01); B65H 75/4478 (2013.01); B65H 2555/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048793 A1 20001102; GB 9909457 D0 19990623

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-08-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040519

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: GB

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010405

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): GB

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI