Global patent index - EP 1048795 A2

EP 1048795 A2 2000-11-02 - Screen panel connectors

Title (en)

Screen panel connectors

Title (de)

Verbinder für Scheidungspanele

Title (fr)

Connecteurs pour panneaux d'écrans

Publication

EP 1048795 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00303497 A

Priority

GB 9909775 A

Abstract (en)

A panel connector comprising a panel connector part and a link part 42, said respective parts having interengaging formations for locating said parts relative to one another and further comprising locking means for securing the parts together, said locking means comprising a locking port 54 for receiving a locking fastener 56, said locking port 54 being defined by respective formations 48, 50 provided in opposed surfaces of the respective parts, the link part formation 50 being provided in an end face of the link part 42. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/74 (2006.01); E04B 1/61 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/7425 (2013.01); E04B 1/6162 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048795 A2 20001102; EP 1048795 A3 20020828; GB 2349396 A 20001101; GB 2349396 B 20030813; GB 9909775 D0 19990623

INPADOC legal status

2005-02-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040817

2003-06-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030425

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030228

2002-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-08-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 04B 2/74 A, 7E 04B 1/61 B

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI