Global Patent Index - EP 1048797 A3

EP 1048797 A3 2001-05-16 - Dry stackable building block

Title (en)

Dry stackable building block

Title (de)

Trockenmauerelement

Title (fr)

Bloc de construction empilable à sec

Publication

EP 1048797 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99123087 A

Priority

CH 79599 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1048797A2] The dry wall element (1) has a base plate (2) with vertical side walls (3,4) of concrete rising upwards from it. A leading closure wall (5) is a separate component of pref. degradable material, inserted into holders (6',6) such as grooves at least at side walls (3,4). The degradable material is of willow wicker, natural fibers, geotextiles and the like or compressed organic fibers, and can be reinforced by a wire grid.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 1/39; E02D 29/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 29/02 (2006.01); E04C 1/39 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 29/025 (2013.01); E04C 1/395 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048797 A2 20001102; EP 1048797 A3 20010516; CH 693645 A5 20031128

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011117

2002-03-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04C 1/39 A, 7E 02D 29/02 B

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI