Global Patent Index - EP 1048800 A2

EP 1048800 A2 2000-11-02 - Flooring tile

Title (en)

Flooring tile

Title (de)

Bodenplatte

Title (fr)

Dalle de revêtement de sol

Publication

EP 1048800 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00108741 A

Priority

DE 29907682 U

Abstract (en)

The tile for floor lining is made of cuttable material such as old tire granulate. The underside of the plate (1) has regula spaced recesses, whilst its edges have a negative step (9) and a positive step (7), which evolve into one another. The plate has rectangular cross-section and the positive step is provided on two side edges of the plate, enclosing an angle between them. The negative step is arranged on opposite side edges of the plate. The locating surfaces of the positive and negative steps running parallel to the plate are arranged in the middle of the total thickness of the plate. The recesses are conically widened the underside of the plate.

Abstract (de)

Die neuartige Bodenplatte (1) besteht aus einem Recyclingmaterial, insbesondere einem aus Altreifen gewonnenen Recyclingmaterial. Sie besitzt einen im wesentlichen rechteckigen Querschnitt und weist auf der Unterseite konische Ausnehmungen auf. Die Seitenkanten besitzen Stufen (7,9), die in der Mitte der Gesamtdicke (2) der Bodenplatte (1) verlaufen und ineinander übergehen. Die Bodenplatte (1) eignet sich in besonderer Weise zum Verlegen im Verbund und für Kinderspielplätze sowie für Spiel- und Sportanlagen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 15/02; E01C 13/04; E04F 15/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 5/18 (2006.01); E04F 15/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 15/10 (2013.01); E01C 5/18 (2013.01); E01C 2201/12 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29907682 U1 20000907; EP 1048800 A2 20001102; EP 1048800 A3 20010801

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020202

2002-05-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-04-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-08-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-07-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: REGUM GMBH

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI