Global Patent Index - EP 1048802 A2

EP 1048802 A2 2000-11-02 - Height adjustable floor

Title (en)

Height adjustable floor

Title (de)

Höhenverstellbare Bodenfläche

Title (fr)

Plancher ajustable en hauteur

Publication

EP 1048802 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00105633 A

Priority

DE 29907582 U

Abstract (en)

The floor surface comprises several adjoining platforms (P) of which one or more which are adjustable by a common displaceab support structure (T) can be adjusted and used individually and independently of any adjoining preceding or following platform i one or more operating level. Several platforms can be formed into a uniform level surface with variable surface area and/or into stepped areas. The individual adjustment is by support devices. An entrainment connection and coupling to a common adjustable support structure allows stepped and infinite adjustment.

Abstract (de)

Eine höhenverstellbare Bodenfläche zur Errichtung von Bühnen und Tribünen besteht aus mehreren nebeneinander liegenden Plattformen P. Diese werden von mindestens einem gemeinsamen Tragwerk T getragen, wobei ein Tragwerk T wiederum von einem oder mehreren Hebe- und Senkantrieben H angetrieben wird. Die Plattformen P sind in ihrer Höhenlage relativ zu der Höhenlage des Tragwerkes T höhenmäßig individuell einstellbar und/oder mittels Stützeinrichtungen abstützbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 3/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 3/12 (2006.01); E04H 3/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 3/126 (2013.01); E04H 3/26 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29907582 U1 19990729; EP 1048802 A2 20001102; EP 1048802 A3 20011004

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020405

2002-08-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-06-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04H 3/24 A, 7E 04H 3/12 B, 7E 04H 3/26 B

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI