Global Patent Index - EP 1048808 A1

EP 1048808 A1 2000-11-02 - Vehicle door lock or similar with assisted electrical opening and closing

Title (en)

Vehicle door lock or similar with assisted electrical opening and closing

Title (de)

Kraftfahrzeug-Türschloss o. dgl. mit elektrischer Öffnungshilfe und Schliesshilfe

Title (fr)

Serrure de porte de véhicule avec assistance électrique pour l'ouverture et la fermeture

Publication

EP 1048808 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00108495 A

Priority

DE 19919765 A

Abstract (en)

The automobile door lock has a locking catch (2) and a cooperating latch (3) for holding the locking catch in a main locking position and a pre-locking position. A locking drive (6) with an electric motor and a conversion gearing (8) is operated by an electronic control for moving the catch into the main locking position, with operation of the locking drive as an opening drive movement of the latch out of engagement with the locking catch, via the electronic control in response to a sensor detecting an increased resistance force on the latch in an emergency situation, with release of an electromagnetic clutch (10) coupling the locking drive to the catch.

Abstract (de)

Gegenstand der Erfindung ist ein Kraftfahrzeug-Türschloß o. dgl. mit einer Schloßfalle (2) und einer die Schloßfalle (2) in einer Hauptrast (2a), und einer Vorrast (2b) haltenden Sperrklinke (3), mit einem elektrischen Öffnungshilfsantrieb (5), der eingeschaltet wird, um die Sperrklinke (3) aus der Hauptrast (2a) oder der Vorrast (2b) der Schloßfalle auszuheben, mit einem elektrischen Schließhilfsantrieb (6), der eingeschaltet wird, nachdem die Schloßfalle (2) eine Vorschließstellung erreicht hat, und die Schloßfalle (2) dann motorisch in die Hauptschließstellung überführt, und mit einer Steuerelektronik, wobei der Schließhilfsantrieb (6) einen elektrischen Antriebsmotor und ein Untersetzungsgetriebe (8) aufweist, das abtriebsseitig mit einem Antriebselement (9) an der Schloßfalle (2) angekoppelt ist, und wobei eine Kupplung (10) zur Schloßfalle (2) hin auskuppelbar ist. Die Erfindung richtet sich darauf, daß der Schließhilfsantrieb (6) auch als Öffnungsantrieb betreibbar ist und dazu an der Sperrklinke (3) angreift, daß die Steuerelektronik mittels eines Sensors feststellt, wenn eine zu einer erhöhten Gegenkraft an der Sperrklinke (3) führende Notfallsituation eingetreten ist und daß bei Erkennen einer Notfallsituation die Steuerelektronik bei Anforderung einer Öffnungsfunktion den Schließhilfsantrieb (6) als Öffnungsantrieb zum Ausheben der Sperrklinke (3) ansteuert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/14 (2014.01); E05B 81/20 (2014.01); E05B 77/02 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/14 (2013.01); E05B 81/20 (2013.01); E05B 77/02 (2013.01); E05B 81/21 (2013.01); Y10S 292/23 (2013.01); Y10T 292/1047 (2015.04); Y10T 292/1082 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048808 A1 20001102; EP 1048808 B1 20041013; DE 19919765 A1 20001109; ES 2226637 T3 20050401; US 6471259 B1 20021029

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070419

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070420

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070420

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070419

2007-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070419

2007-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070430

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-23 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060523

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-04-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060419

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-04-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060410

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-10-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050714

2005-08-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2226637 T3

2005-02-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050202

2005-01-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050113

2004-11-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008184 P 20041118

2004-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2004-10-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BROSE SCHLIESSSYSTEME GMBH & CO. KG

2003-09-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030721

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010502

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI