Global Patent Index - EP 1048818 A1

EP 1048818 A1 2000-11-02 - Device for protection against insects

Title (en)

Device for protection against insects

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Schutz von Insekten

Title (fr)

Dispositif de protection contre des insects

Publication

EP 1048818 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00108488 A

Priority

DE 19918978 A

Abstract (en)

The window or door insect screen structure has a frame (1) mounting holding the mesh (2) as a screen to prevent the entry of insects. The screen mounting (1) has a coupling (3) for functional units (4) of any type, such as a magnet and/or seal and/or an alarm connection. The coupling (3) is of metal to be held by the magnet when the screen is closed and/or the frame (7) can be of metal or plastics.

Abstract (de)

Eine Vorrichtung zum Schutz vor Insekten, insbesondere vor Stechmücken, Spinnen und Fliegen, mit einer rahmenartigen Einfassung (1) und einer der Einfassung (1) zugeordneten Insektenabwehreinrichtung (2) ist im Hinblick auf einen dauerhaften Schutz vor Insekten und eine hohe Gestaltungsvielfalt derart ausgebildet, daß der Einfassung (1) eine Kopplungseinrichtung (3) für Funktionselemente (4) jedweder Art zugeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/52; E06B 3/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/52 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048818 A1 20001102; DE 19918978 A1 20001130

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031007

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030326

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010502

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI