Global Patent Index - EP 1048819 A1

EP 1048819 A1 2000-11-02 - Closed loop fluid-handling system for use during drilling of wellbores

Title (en)

Closed loop fluid-handling system for use during drilling of wellbores

Title (de)

System zur Spülungsaufbereitung im geschlossenen Kreislauf zum Einsatz in Brunnenbohrungen

Title (fr)

Système de manutention de fluides en boucle fermée utilisé au cours du forage de puits

Publication

EP 1048819 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00112899 A

Priority

  • EP 97922650 A
  • US 64282896 A
  • US 3075296 P

Abstract (en)

This invention provides a fluid-handling system for use in underbalanced drilling operations. The system includes a first vessel which acts as a four phase separator. The first vessel includes a first stage for separating solids. Oil and gas are separated at a second stage. A pressure sensor provides signals to a pressure controller, which modulates a gas flow valve coupled to the vessel for discharging gas from the first vessel. The pressure controller maintains the pressure in the first vessel at a predetermined value. An oil level sensor placed in the first vessel provides a signal to an oil level controller. The oil level controller modulates an oil flow valve coupled to the vessel to discharge oil from the first vessel into a second vessel. Water is discharged into a third vessel. Water from the third vessel is discharged via a water flow control valve, which is modulated by a level controller as a function of the water level in the third vessel. Any gas in the third vessel is discharged by modulating a gas control valve as a function of the pressure in the third vessel. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 21/08; E21B 21/06; E21B 21/14; E21B 44/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 21/06 (2006.01); E21B 21/08 (2006.01); E21B 21/14 (2006.01); E21B 44/00 (2006.01); E21B 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 21/06 (2013.01); E21B 21/08 (2013.01); E21B 21/14 (2013.01); E21B 44/00 (2013.01); E21B 2021/006 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 5249635 A 19931005 - KING CHARLES W [US], et al

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048819 A1 20001102; EP 1048819 B1 20040225

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160504

- Year of fee payment: 20

2005-02-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041126

2004-02-25 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 0897454

- Country of Ref Document: EP

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): GB

2004-02-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-10-02 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-08-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020716

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: GB

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BRADFIELD, DAVID, H.

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: CUMMINS, DAVID P.J.

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BRIDGER, PHILIP J.

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000822

2000-11-02 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 897454

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): GB