Global Patent Index - EP 1048822 A2

EP 1048822 A2 2000-11-02 - Heat shield for a gas turbine

Title (en)

Heat shield for a gas turbine

Title (de)

Hitzeschild für eine Gasturbine

Title (fr)

Bouclier thermique pour turbine à gaz

Publication

EP 1048822 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00810216 A

Priority

DE 19919654 A

Abstract (en)

At the heat shield for a gas turbine, cooling drillings (27,28) are in both longitudinal sides of the heat shield segments. Cooling air passes through the drillings from the hollow space between the paired arms (21-24) into the radial gap (29,30) betwe the longitudinal sides of the heat shield segments (17) and the neighboring outer (14) and intermediate (15) rings, to prevent t entry of hot gases from the hot gas channel (11) entering the gaps (29,30).

Abstract (de)

Ein Hitzeschild für eine Gasturbine (10), welches die im Heissgaskanal (11) der Gasturbine (10) rotierenden Laufschaufeln (12) einer Stufe der Gasturbine (10) ringförmig umschliesst, besteht aus einer Mehrzahl von in Umfangsrichtung hintereinander angeordneten, kreissegmentförmig gekrümmten und von aussen gekühlten Hitzeschildsegmenten (17, 17'), deren Längsseiten als in Umfangsrichtung verlaufende, entsprechend gekrümmte Schienen mit jeweils einem Paar in axialer Richtung abstehender, parallel verlaufender und voneinander beabstandeter Arme (21, 22 bzw. 23, 24) ausgebildet sind. Die Hitzeschildsegmente (17, 17') sind unter Bildung eines mit Kühlluft beaufschlagbaren Hohlraumes (20) an der Innenseite eines ringförmigen Trägers (16) befestigt, welcher den Hitzeschild konzentrisch umgibt, derart, dass zwischen den Längsseiten der Hitzeschildsegmente (17, 17') und den angrenzenden Elementen (14, 15), welche den Heissgaskanal (11) nach aussen begrenzen, jeweils ein radialer Spalt (29, 30) gebildet wird Bei einem solchen Hitzeschild wird eine verbesserte Kühlung dadurch erreicht, dass in beiden Längsseiten der Hitzeschildsegmente Kühlbohrungen (27, 28) vorgesehen sind, durch welche Kühlluft aus dem Hohlraum (20) in die zwischen den Armpaaren (21, 22 bzw. 23, 24) gebildeten Zwischenräume (25, 26) und von dort in die Spalte (29, 30) einströmen und dem Eindringen von Heissgasen aus dem Heissgaskanal (11) in die Spalte (29, 30) entgegenwirken kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 25/12; F01D 11/24; F01D 25/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 11/24 (2006.01); F01D 25/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 25/12 (2013.01); F01D 11/24 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048822 A2 20001102; EP 1048822 A3 20020731; EP 1048822 B1 20060517; DE 19919654 A1 20001102; DE 50012746 D1 20060622; US 6302642 B1 20011016

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 50012746

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50012746

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ROESLER, UWE, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070220

2006-09-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20060814

2006-06-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50012746

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-06-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2006-05-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-04-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050311

2004-03-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-04-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2003-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030130

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-07-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 01D 25/12 A, 7F 01D 25/24 B, 7F 01D 11/24 B, 7F 01D 11/08 B

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI