Global Patent Index - EP 1048823 A2

EP 1048823 A2 2000-11-02 - Sealing steam supply

Title (en)

Sealing steam supply

Title (de)

Sperrdampfeinspeisung

Title (fr)

Alimentation de vapeur de barrage

Publication

EP 1048823 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00810328 A

Priority

DE 19919653 A

Abstract (en)

The blocking steam supply circuit has a tap-off point (24) provided at a point in the steam over heater (2) which is below t fresh steam temperature and at which the steam temperature corresponds to the material temperature of a high pressure shaft seal (55), coupled via a supply line (7) to the blocking steam system (9). A regulating valve (8) can be incorporated in the blocking steam supply line.

Abstract (de)

Dem Sperrdampfsystem einer Dampfturbine muss in manschen Betriebszuständen Zusatz-Sperrdampf zugeführt werden. Die Zufuhr von Zusatz-Sperrdampf aus der Frischdampfleitung ist mit erheblichen Problemen behaftet. Erfindungsgemäss wird daher das Sperrdampfsystem (9) über eine Anspeiseleitung (7) einer Entnahmestelle des Überhitzers des Kessels verbunden, so, dass die Temperatur des Zusatz-Sperrdampfes weit unterhalb der Frischdampfdaten liegt, und insbesondere mit der Materialtemperatur im Bereich der Hochdruck-Wellendichtung (55)kompatibel ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01K 7/16; F01D 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 11/04 (2006.01); F01D 11/06 (2006.01); F01D 25/16 (2006.01); F01K 3/18 (2006.01); F01K 7/16 (2006.01); F22G 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01K 7/16 (2013.01); F01D 11/06 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0605156 B1 19970903 - GEN ELECTRIC [US]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048823 A2 20001102; EP 1048823 A3 20021127; CN 1274056 A 20001122; DE 19919653 A1 20001102; JP 2000328903 A 20001128; US 6237543 B1 20010529

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-21 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030505

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI