Global Patent Index - EP 1048823 A3

EP 1048823 A3 2002-11-27 - Sealing steam supply

Title (en)

Sealing steam supply

Title (de)

Sperrdampfeinspeisung

Title (fr)

Alimentation de vapeur de barrage

Publication

EP 1048823 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00810328 A

Priority

DE 19919653 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1048823A2] The blocking steam supply circuit has a tap-off point (24) provided at a point in the steam over heater (2) which is below t fresh steam temperature and at which the steam temperature corresponds to the material temperature of a high pressure shaft seal (55), coupled via a supply line (7) to the blocking steam system (9). A regulating valve (8) can be incorporated in the blocking steam supply line.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01K 7/16; F01D 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 11/04 (2006.01); F01D 11/06 (2006.01); F01D 25/16 (2006.01); F01K 3/18 (2006.01); F01K 7/16 (2006.01); F22G 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01K 7/16 (2013.01); F01D 11/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048823 A2 20001102; EP 1048823 A3 20021127; CN 1274056 A 20001122; DE 19919653 A1 20001102; JP 2000328903 A 20001128; US 6237543 B1 20010529

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-21 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030505

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI