Global Patent Index - EP 1048824 A3

EP 1048824 A3 2001-12-19 - Combustion engine with frontal gear drive

Title (en)

Combustion engine with frontal gear drive

Title (de)

Brennkraftmaschine mit Stirnradgetriebe

Title (fr)

Moteur à combustion interne avec entraînement frontal aux roues dentées

Publication

EP 1048824 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00105301 A

Priority

DE 19919659 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1048824A2] The combustion engine has an engine block (11) with a rotary crankshaft coupled to a parallel camshaft by spline gearing wit crankshaft cog (10) and at least one camshaft cog (14,16), coupled together via intermediate cogs (20,22,24) mounted on a cog carrier (32) coupled to the engine block via a pivot mounting (34) and a second fixing point (48) allowing limited angular movem about the pivot mounting.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 1/02; F02B 67/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/02 (2006.01); F02B 67/04 (2006.01); F02F 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/026 (2013.01); F01L 1/02 (2013.01); F02B 67/04 (2013.01); F02F 7/0073 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048824 A2 20001102; EP 1048824 A3 20011219; DE 19919659 A1 20001102

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-12 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060113

2005-03-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050209

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020619

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI