Global Patent Index - EP 1048829 A1

EP 1048829 A1 2000-11-02 - Exhaust manifold for multicylinder internal combustion engines

Title (en)

Exhaust manifold for multicylinder internal combustion engines

Title (de)

Auspuffkrümmer für mehrzylindrige Brennkraftmaschinen

Title (fr)

Collecteur d'échappement pour moteurs à combustion interne à plusieurs cylindres

Publication

EP 1048829 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99125725 A

Priority

DE 19918988 A

Abstract (en)

The exhaust manifold for a multi-cylinder internal combustion motor has expansion units between adjacent cylinders, as hermetically sealed compensators (3). The compensator (3) has a U-shape (4) on a longitudinal section, integrated with the manif (1) in a common casting, or as a separate sheet plate component with both end sides cast into the manifold (1).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf einen Auspuffkrümmer für mehrzylindrige Brennkraftmaschinen. Auspuffkrümmer mehrzylindriger Brennkraftmaschinen bedürfen wegen der Wärmedehnung eines Längenausgleiches. Bekannt sind Schiebesitze, die jedoch auf Dauer keine Gasdichtheit gewährleisten. Erfindungsgemäß werden gasdichte Kompensatoren 3 vorgeschlagen. Diese bilden mit dem Auspuffkrümmer 1 eine bauliche Einheit. Besonders vorteilhaft ist die Ausbildung des Kompensators 3 als eine U-förmige, umlaufende Ausstülpung 4, die wie der Auspuffkrümmer 1 in Gießtechnik hergestellt ist. ( Fig. 1) Ist eine besonders nachgiebige, jedoch unbedingt gasdichte Verbindung erforderlich, kann der Kompensator 3 als ein separates Blechteil 5 ausgeführt sein, welches an seinen Stirnseiten 6a, 6b in den Auspuffkrümmer 1 eingegossen ist. ( Fig. 2 )

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 13/10 (2010.01); F01N 13/18 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 13/1811 (2013.01); F01N 13/10 (2013.01); F01N 2260/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048829 A1 20001102; DE 19918988 A1 20001102

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020129

2001-10-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010917

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL SE

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001128

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI