Global Patent Index - EP 1048834 A2

EP 1048834 A2 2000-11-02 - Method for correcting the characteristic curve of a linear lambda sensor

Title (en)

Method for correcting the characteristic curve of a linear lambda sensor

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Korrektur der Kennlinie einer Breitband-Lambda-Sonde

Title (fr)

Méthode pour corriger la courbe caractéristique d'une sonde lambda linéaire

Publication

EP 1048834 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00107491 A

Priority

DE 19919427 A

Abstract (en)

A lambda probe (LP) is fitted in an exhaust gas purifier for an internal combustion engine upstream from a catalytic convert Determined in the phase for fuel cut-off in the overrun (FCO), the LP's signal level is assigned to the lambda value correspondi to the oxygen concentration in the surrounding air. An increase in the LP's signal (1p) is taken into account during FCO. A desi value curve (2) for the LP shows no carbon hydride emissions in the FCO.

Abstract (de)

Zur Korrektur der Kennlinie einer Breitband-Lambda-Sonde (5), die in einer Abgasreinigungsanlage einer Brennkraftmaschine (10) stromauf eines Katalysators (6) angeordnet ist, wird in einer Schubabschaltungsphase ein Signalpegel des Signals der Lambda-Sonde (5) bestimmt und dem der Sauerstoffkonzentration der Umgebungsluft entsprechende Lambda-Wert zugeordnet. Dabei wird die Steigung des Signals der Lambda-Sonde (5) während der Schubabschaltung berücksichtigt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/12 (2006.01); F02D 41/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/1441 (2013.01); F02D 41/123 (2013.01); F02D 41/1456 (2013.01); F02D 41/1486 (2013.01); F02D 41/1493 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19842425 A1 20000330 - SIEMENS AG [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048834 A2 20001102; EP 1048834 A3 20020807; DE 19919427 A1 20001102; DE 19919427 C2 20010920

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030208

2003-06-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI