Global Patent Index - EP 1048841 A1

EP 1048841 A1 2000-11-02 - Fuel supply system of an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Fuel supply system of an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Kraftstoffversorgungssystem einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Système d'alimentation en carburant d'un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1048841 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00107444 A

Priority

DE 19918984 A

Abstract (en)

Fuel is fed from a fuel tank (6) to an injection pump via a filter (13) and a feed pump (12). Excess fuel is returned to the fuel tank via a return pipe. A four-cylinder-version crankcase (2) is fitted with four single injection pump elements (3) that use a short injection pipe (4) to feed fuel to an injection valve (5) that injects the fuel under higher pressure.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem konventionellen Kraftstoffsystem wird der Kraftstoff aus einem Kraftstofftank 6 über ein Filter 13 und eine Förderpumpe 12 in eine Einspritzpumpe gefördert und überschüssiger Kraftstoff über eine Rücklaufleitung in den Kraftstofftank 6 zurückgeleitet. Erfindungsgemäß wird ein Kraftstoffversorgungssystem bereitgestellt, das hinsichtlich der Dimensionierung der zwischen Kraftstofftank 6 und Einspritzpumpe geschalteten Bauteile optimiert ist. Dies wird dadurch erreicht, daß der Kraftstofftank 6 ausschließlich mit dem Maschinenkreislauf 17 über eine Kraftstoffzufuhrleitung 7 verschaltet ist, über die nur der verbrauchte Kraftstoff aus dem Kraftstofftank zugeführt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 37/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/00 (2006.01); F02M 55/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/0058 (2013.01); F02M 55/00 (2013.01); F02M 55/007 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 2841768 A1 19800410 - BOSCH GMBH ROBERT

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048841 A1 20001102; EP 1048841 B1 20041201; DE 19918984 A1 20001102

INPADOC legal status


2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-06-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070407

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060323

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-04-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070419

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-03-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060313

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-11-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050902

2005-10-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-06-29 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20041201

2005-03-15 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008796 P 20050105

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2004-12-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-12-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-12-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041201

2003-10-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030827

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT SE

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010427

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI