Global Patent Index - EP 1048844 A1

EP 1048844 A1 2000-11-02 - Method and device for starting, braking and reversing of a two-stroke diesel engine

Title (en)

Method and device for starting, braking and reversing of a two-stroke diesel engine

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Starten, Bremsen und Umsteuern eines Zweitakt-dieselmotors

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour démarrage, freinage et inversion du sens de rotation d'un moteur Diesel à deux temps

Publication

EP 1048844 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00810307 A

Priority

  • EP 00810307 A
  • EP 99810363 A

Abstract (en)

By relying on the swing angle of a piston shaft, compressed fluid such as compressed air is fed to one or more cylinders, so that a piston in a cylinder is accelerated or slowed down by the pressure (20) change resulting from this. A cylinder's outlet valve varied when opened and closed regarding the swing angle of the piston shaft.

Abstract (de)

Beim Verfahren zum Starten, Bremsen oder Umsteuern eines Zweitakt-Dieselmotors wird ein komprimiertes Fluid, insbesondere Druckluft, derart in Abhängigkeit vom Drehwinkel der Kurbelwelle zumindest einem Zylinder zugeführt wird, dass ein sich im Zylinder befindlicher Kolben durch die daraus resultierende Druckveränderung beschleunigt oder abgebremst wird, wobei das Auslassventil (4a) des Zylinders bezüglich dem Drehwinkel der Kurbelwelle variierbar geöffnet und geschlossen wird, und wobei zum Starten die schliessende Flanke (22b) für das Auslassventil (4a) zum oberen Totpunkt (OTP) hin verschoben wird, sodass der Zylinder im wesentlichen kompressionslos gehalten wird, und wobei zum Bremsen die öffnende Flanke (22b) für das Auslassventil (4a) zum oberen Totpunkt (OTP) hin verschoben wird, sodass ein vorzeitiger Druckabfall im Zylinder resultiert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02N 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02N 9/04 (2006.01); F02D 13/04 (2006.01); F02D 13/08 (2006.01); F02D 27/00 (2006.01); F02D 45/00 (2006.01); F02B 3/06 (2006.01); F02B 75/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02N 9/04 (2013.01); F02B 3/06 (2013.01); F02B 2075/025 (2013.01); F02F 2007/0097 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048844 A1 20001102; EP 1048844 B1 20041013; CN 1201077 C 20050511; CN 1272594 A 20001108; DE 50008185 D1 20041118; DK 1048844 T3 20041108; JP 2000320437 A 20001121; NO 20002237 A 20001031; NO 20002237 D0 20000428; NO 323742 B1 20070702; PL 199244 B1 20080829; PL 339895 A1 20001106

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161101

2016-11-21 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

- Effective date: 20160430

2016-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50008185

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150430

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150420

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150421

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101101

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20101230

2010-11-10 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20101101

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090414

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090415

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-10-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050714

2005-08-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-11-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50008185

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-11-18

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-11-08 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2004-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR IT NL

2003-12-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031017

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE DK FR IT NL

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-03-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WAERTSILAE SCHWEIZ AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR IT NL

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI