Global Patent Index - EP 1048845 A1

EP 1048845 A1 2000-11-02 - Starter/generator for motor vehicles

Title (en)

Starter/generator for motor vehicles

Title (de)

Anlasser/Generator für Kraftfahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Démarreur/Générateur pour véhicules automobiles

Publication

EP 1048845 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00107492 A

Priority

JP 11901099 A

Abstract (en)

The invention provides a starter/generator which can be disposed on an end of a crankshaft without increasing the length of the crankshaft. To achieve this, a starter/generator includes a brushless motor 44 having a rotor 15 connected to an end of a crankshaft 12 and a stator including a starter coil 51 and a generator coil 50, a start control means (a three-phase driver 104, a rotor sensor 56, etc.) for converting a battery voltage into AC power and supplying the AC power to the starter coil 51 of the brushless motor 44, and a generation control means (a regulator 52) for supplying electromotive forces induced across the generator coil 50 of the brushless motor 44 to electric loads. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02N 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02P 5/15 (2006.01); F02D 17/00 (2006.01); F02D 29/06 (2006.01); F02N 11/04 (2006.01); F02B 61/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02N 11/04 (2013.01); F01P 2050/16 (2013.01); F02B 61/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

JP H10148142 A 19980602 - HONDA MOTOR CO LTD

Citation (search report)

  • [YA] EP 0619427 A1 19941012 - FIAT AUTO SPA [IT]
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 392 (M - 1450) 22 July 1993 (1993-07-22)
  • [DA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 11 30 September 1998 (1998-09-30)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048845 A1 20001102; EP 1048845 B1 20040811; CN 1263950 C 20060712; CN 1271653 A 20001101; DE 60012812 D1 20040916; DE 60012812 T2 20050113; JP 2000310134 A 20001107; JP 4117816 B2 20080716; TW 487775 B 20020521

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-06 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60012812

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131101

2013-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120406

2013-01-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121228

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120419

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-04-05 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 60012812

- Effective date: 20120209

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110415

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110426

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-08-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050512

2005-05-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60012812 P 20040916

2004-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030805

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010124

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI