Global patent index - EP 1048849 A1

EP 1048849 A1 2000-11-02 - High pressure liquid pump

Title (en)

High pressure liquid pump

Title (de)

Flüssigkeitshochdruckpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe à haute pression pour tous liquides

Publication

EP 1048849 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00202790 A

Priority

  • EP 97926060 A
  • FR 9607043 A
  • FR 9613502 A

Abstract (en)

The pump assembly combines a hydraulic pump (I) and a membrane pump (II) in which supple membranes are reciprocated by the displacement of a pumped hydraulic fluid. The pistons (4) of the first pump are hollow and traversed by the hydraulic fluid whic passes in the suction phase through a curved recess in a swashplate (1) or cam. The membrane (24) of the second pump is held in place by a spring (15). At the end of each piston's compression stroke ther a communication between the chamber (12,13) containing the fluid forced against the membrane and the suction chamber (9). The hydraulic fluid is drawn by the movement of the pistons and compressed by the membrane, which ensures a heat exchange between he and non-heated fluids and a return of the membrane to its initial position.

Abstract (fr)

Une pompe qui permet de pomper n'importe quelle sorte de liquide tout en lui imprimant une pression de roulement très élevée. Les éléments (24, 44) qui provoquent l'aspiration puis le refoulement du liquide à pomper sont entraînés par des moyens exclusivement hydrauliques à l'exclusion de moyens mécaniques ; de sorte qu'il n'y a aucun contact matériel entre lesdits éléments moteurs et le produit pompé et qu'ainsi ledit produit ne peut pas détériorer lesdits éléments mécaniques moteurs, la chambre recevant le liquide hydraulique étant à la fin de chaque cycle de compression remise en communication directe avec la réserve de liquide hydraulique. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 43/067; F02M 59/10; F04B 1/14; F04B 53/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 59/04 (2006.01); F02M 59/08 (2006.01); F02M 59/10 (2006.01); F02M 59/14 (2006.01); F02M 59/24 (2006.01); F04B 1/14 (2006.01); F04B 1/22 (2006.01); F04B 43/067 (2006.01); F04B 53/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 59/246 (2013.01); F02M 59/04 (2013.01); F02M 59/08 (2013.01); F02M 59/105 (2013.01); F02M 59/14 (2013.01); F02M 59/243 (2013.01); F04B 1/14 (2013.01); F04B 43/067 (2013.01); F04B 53/142 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9747883 A1 19971218; DE 69732802 D1 20050421; DE 69732802 T2 20060406; EP 0901575 A1 19990317; EP 0901575 B1 20110601; EP 1048849 A1 20001102; EP 1048849 B1 20050316; ES 2238968 T3 20050916; JP 2000511989 A 20000912; JP 3990732 B2 20071017; PT 1048849 E 20050531; US 6264437 B1 20010724

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160527

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-06-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20140606

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130530

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130530

2014-02-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69732802

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130530

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120524

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120522

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120521

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120514

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-06-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-01-15 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2007-12-17 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2006-05-18 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060518

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-04-26 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060426

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-03-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20051219

2005-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2238968

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-07-12 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2005-05-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20050329

2005-05-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050420

2005-04-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69732802

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-04-21

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-03-16 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 0901575

- Country of Ref Document: EP

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-03-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

2005-03-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-03-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HYDRO LEDUC

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000930

2000-11-02 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 901575

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT SE