Global Patent Index - EP 1048851 A2

EP 1048851 A2 2000-11-02 - Water coolant pump for internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Water coolant pump for internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Kühlwasserpumpe für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Pompe à eau pour refroidissement de moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1048851 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00890130 A

Priority

AT 77399 A

Abstract (en)

The installation includes a leakage chamber (11) for taking up coolant passing through the sealing element (9). The leakage chamber is set in a recess of the housing and has an opening (13) to the outside which is closed by a metal foil which is applie a flange face (14) which is flush with an end face (12) of the housing. The foil is stuck, soldered or welded onto the flange face. The leakage chamber connected with a space between sealing elem and bearing through a connecting duct.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Kühlwasserpumpe für eine Brennkraftmaschine mit innerer Verbrennung, mit einem Gehäuse (1), das ein Lager (2) zur Lagerung einer Pumpenwelle (5) aufweist und mit einem Dichtelement (9) zur Abdichtung des Lagers gegenüber einem das Kühlmedium enthaltenden Arbeitsraum, sowie mit einem Leckageraum (11) zur Aufnahme von Kühlmedium, das durch das Dichtelement (9) hindurchgetreten ist, wobei der Leckageraum (11) in einer Ausnehmung des Gehäuses (1) angeordnet ist und eine Öffnung (13) nach außen aufweist, die durch eine Verschlusseinrichtung teilweise verschlossen ist. Eine besonders einfache Herstellung wird dadurch erreicht, dass die Öffnung (13) durch eine Folie, vorzugsweise eine Metallfolie, verschlossen ist , die an einer Flanschfläche (14) aufgebracht ist, die bündig mit einer Stirnfläche (12) des Gehäuses (1) ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/08 (2006.01); F04D 29/10 (2006.01); F04D 29/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/106 (2013.01); F04D 29/086 (2013.01); F04D 29/426 (2013.01); F05B 2260/603 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048851 A2 20001102; EP 1048851 A3 20010822; EP 1048851 B1 20030604; AT 409530 B 20020925; AT A77399 A 20020115; DE 50002419 D1 20030710; ES 2195851 T3 20031216; US 6270312 B1 20010807

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2011-10-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50002419

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100331

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080427

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070428

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070428

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070523

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060427

2006-04-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060427

2006-04-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060425

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-04-20 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060420

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-04-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050412

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-03-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2195851 T3

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50002419 P 20030710

2003-06-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011008

2001-08-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI