Global Patent Index - EP 1048851 B1

EP 1048851 B1 2003-06-04 - Water coolant pump for internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Water coolant pump for internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Kühlwasserpumpe für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Pompe à eau pour refroidissement de moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1048851 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 00890130 A

Priority

AT 77399 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1048851A2] The installation includes a leakage chamber (11) for taking up coolant passing through the sealing element (9). The leakage chamber is set in a recess of the housing and has an opening (13) to the outside which is closed by a metal foil which is applie a flange face (14) which is flush with an end face (12) of the housing. The foil is stuck, soldered or welded onto the flange face. The leakage chamber connected with a space between sealing elem and bearing through a connecting duct.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/08 (2006.01); F04D 29/10 (2006.01); F04D 29/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/106 (2013.01); F04D 29/086 (2013.01); F04D 29/426 (2013.01); F05B 2260/603 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048851 A2 20001102; EP 1048851 A3 20010822; EP 1048851 B1 20030604; AT 409530 B 20020925; AT A77399 A 20020115; DE 50002419 D1 20030710; ES 2195851 T3 20031216; US 6270312 B1 20010807

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2011-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50002419

2011-10-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50002419

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100331

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080427

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070428

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070428

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070523

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060427

2006-04-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060427

2006-04-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060425

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-04-20 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060420

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-04-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050412

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-03-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2195851 T3

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50002419 P 20030710

2003-06-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011008

2001-08-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI