Global Patent Index - EP 1048869 A2

EP 1048869 A2 2000-11-02 - Hydrostatic coupling

Title (en)

Hydrostatic coupling

Title (de)

Hydrostatische Kupplung

Title (fr)

Accouplement hydrostatique

Publication

EP 1048869 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00108385 A

Priority

JP 11791199 A

Abstract (en)

An axially extending extension is formed on a bearing retainer provided adjacent to a valve block of a joint and press-fitted into the interior of a housing. The extension has at its outer peripheral end a bearing by way of which the bearing retainer is rotatably supported by a differential gear case located outside thereof. This allows moment arising from rotational secondary torque received by the housing to be transmitted from the bearing retainer extension via the bearing to the outside differential gear case, thereby preventing the moment from acting on a main shaft which is a centrally located output shaft. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16D 31/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60K 17/34 (2006.01); F16D 31/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16D 31/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048869 A2 20001102; EP 1048869 A3 20030129; EP 1048869 B1 20060830; DE 60030352 D1 20061012; DE 60030352 T2 20070830; JP 2000310251 A 20001107; JP 3658240 B2 20050608; US 6293381 B1 20010925

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-08-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-03-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-10-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60030352 P 20061012

2006-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-08-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-10-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030214

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI