Global Patent Index - EP 1048870 A2

EP 1048870 A2 2000-11-02 - Hydrostatic coupling

Title (en)

Hydrostatic coupling

Title (de)

Hydrostatische Kupplung

Title (fr)

Accouplement hydrostatique

Publication

EP 1048870 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00108386 A

Priority

JP 11791299 A

Abstract (en)

A plunger is accommodated in each of a plurality of plunger chambers formed axially in a rotor, with the plunger being displaced by rotation of a cam face associated with a housing. A first one way valve for intake is incorporated in the head of each plunger and a second one way valve for discharge is disposed within in a discharge hole leading to the plunger chambers. The intake stroke of the plunger caused by rotation of the cam opens the first one way valve to suck oil from a low pressure chamber into the plunger chamber. The discharge stroke of the plunger opens the second one way valve to allow the discharged oil to flow through the orifice into the low pressure chamber, whereby a torque corresponding to the relative rotational-speed difference is transmitted from the housing side to the rotor side. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16D 31/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60K 17/34 (2006.01); F16D 31/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16D 31/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048870 A2 20001102; EP 1048870 A3 20030129; JP 2000310252 A 20001107; JP 3699858 B2 20050928; US 6257387 B1 20010710

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060815

2003-10-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030214

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI