Global Patent Index - EP 1048891 A3

EP 1048891 A3 2002-09-11 - Method for providing a continous gas supply

Title (en)

Method for providing a continous gas supply

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Bereitstellung einer kontinuierlichen Erdgasversorgung

Title (fr)

Méthode pour établir une alimentation de gaz continue

Publication

EP 1048891 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00108331 A

Priority

DE 19919639 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1048891A2] The natural gas supply method has the over production of the natural liquid gas during low demand intervals converted into liquified gas using nitrogen, oxygen, or argon, for storage in a liquid gas tank (14), from which it can be extracted during pea demand intervals, for supplementing the natiural gas supplied to the distribution pipeline network (1) after conversion back int gas. An Independent claim for a continuous natural gas supply device is also included.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F17D 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F17D 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25J 1/0251 (2013.01); F17D 1/04 (2013.01); F25J 1/0022 (2013.01); F25J 1/0221 (2013.01); F25J 1/0254 (2013.01); F25J 2210/42 (2013.01); F25J 2290/60 (2013.01); F25J 2290/62 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048891 A2 20001102; EP 1048891 A3 20020911; DE 19919639 C1 20001116

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-07 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1035936

2003-12-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-07-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-10-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI