Global patent index - EP 1048898 A1

EP 1048898 A1 2000-11-02 - Burner

Title (en)

Burner

Title (de)

Brenner

Title (fr)

Brûleur

Publication

EP 1048898 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98811145 A

Priority

  • EP 98811145 A
  • DE 10022969 A

Abstract (en)

The burner has a pair of interfitting hollow bodies (1,2) extending in the flow direction, with their central axes offset fr one another, their adjacent walls provided with air entry channels for the combustion air, tangential to the burner slits and th inside surfaces provided with projections (32) extending into the space (8) enclosed by the hollow bodies, for providing an axia flow turbulence.

Abstract (de)

Ein Brenner zum Betrieb eines Aggregats zur Erzeugung eines Heißgases besteht im wesentlichen aus mindestens zwei hohlen, in Richtung der Strömung (30) ineinandergeschachtelten Teilkörpern (1, 2), deren Mittelachsen zueinander versetzt verlaufen, dergestalt, daß benachbarte Wandungen der Teilkörper (1, 2) an den Brennerschlitzen (5a, 6a) tangentiale Lufteintrittskanäle (5, 6) für die Einströmung von Verbrennungsluft (7) in einen von den Teilkörpern (1, 2) vorgegebenen Innenraum (8) bilden. Zum Einbringen axialer Wirbelstärke in die Strömung (30) weist der Brenner eine Mehrzahl von in die Strömung (30) ragende Einbauten (32) auf. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23C 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23C 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23C 7/002 (2013.01); F23C 2900/07002 (2013.01); F23D 2210/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048898 A1 20001102; EP 1048898 B1 20040114; DE 10022969 A1 20011115; US 6196835 B1 20010306

INPADOC legal status

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091118

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20091118

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081117

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081121

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-01-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041015

2004-04-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040407

2004-02-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59810606

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-02-19

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2004-01-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021028

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE GB

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010402

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI