Global Patent Index - EP 1048900 A1

EP 1048900 A1 2000-11-02 - Method and device for controlling the combustion of fuel with a variable calorific value

Title (en)

Method and device for controlling the combustion of fuel with a variable calorific value

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Steuern der Verbrennung von Brennstoff mit variablem Heizwert

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de contrôle de la combustion d' un combustible avec un pouvoir calorifique variable

Publication

EP 1048900 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00109028 A

Priority

DE 19919222 A

Abstract (en)

The combustion control method uses a CCD camera (34) for scanning the refuse seized by a gripper (30) and/or deposited in a feed shaft (28) for the burner, with image analysis of the camera image for identifying the refuse material, with corresponding control of at least one combustion parameter. An Independent claim for a combustion control device is also included.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zum Steuern der Verbrennung von Brennstoff mit variablem Heizwert, insbesondere Hausmüll, bei dem mittels eines Greifers (30) Brennstoff aus einem Bunker (33) in ein Ende eines Schachts (28) eingesetzt wird, an dessen anderen Ende der Brennstoff chargenweise auf einen Verbrennungsrost (12) gefördert wird, durch Einstellen von mindestens einem Verbrennungsparameter. Die Erfindung gibt ein Verfahren an, mit dem der Verbrennungsprozeß dadurch besser beherrscht wird, daß mittels mindestens einer Kamera (34) die Oberfläche des in den Schacht (28) eingesetzten Brennstoffs und/oder des vom Greifer (30) erfaßten Brennstoffs aufgenommen wird, daß das aufgenommene Bild hinsichtlich vorbestimmter Bildmerkmale, etwa Farbe, Textur, Körnung und/oder Formen, analysiert wird, und daß der mindestens eine Verbrennungsparameter in Abhängigkeit von dem Analysenergebnis unter Berücksichtigung der für das Durchlaufen des Schachtes (28) erforderlichen Totzeit eingestellt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23G 5/50; F23G 5/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23G 5/44 (2006.01); F23G 5/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23G 5/50 (2013.01); F23G 5/444 (2013.01); F23G 2205/16 (2013.01); F23G 2207/1015 (2013.01); F23G 2207/20 (2013.01); F23G 2900/55007 (2013.01); F23G 2900/55011 (2013.01); F23N 2029/20 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

  • [YD] DE 4220149 A1 19931223 - STEINMUELLER GMBH L & C [DE]
  • [A] EP 0718553 A1 19960626 - ABB MANAGEMENT AG [CH]
  • [XY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 08 29 September 1995 (1995-09-29)
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 03 29 March 1996 (1996-03-29)
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 237 (M - 833) 5 June 1989 (1989-06-05)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 07 31 July 1997 (1997-07-31)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048900 A1 20001102; DE 19919222 C1 20010111

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-02-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010503

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI