Global Patent Index - EP 1048904 A2

EP 1048904 A2 2000-11-02 - Ventilation unit for a filter and ventilation system, in particular for clean rooms

Title (en)

Ventilation unit for a filter and ventilation system, in particular for clean rooms

Title (de)

Lüftereinheit für Filter-Ventilationseinheiten, insbesondere in Reinraumsystemen

Title (fr)

Unitée de ventilation pour un système de filtration et ventilation, en particulier dans une salle blanche

Publication

EP 1048904 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00109032 A

Priority

DE 19919796 A

Abstract (en)

The electric fan has a fan wheel (4) and a drive motor (18-25) supported by a fan housing (1), the fan wheel mounted on a central rotary shaft (7), the cooperating drive components of the motor attached to the fan housing and to the outer periphery of the fa wheel, e.g via an axially offset outer ring (16).

Abstract (de)

Eine Lüftereinheit mit einem Lüfterlaufrad und einem Antriebsmotor ist gegenüber einem Gehäuse gelagert. Das Lüfterlaufrad ist über eine mittige Welle im Verhältnis zum Gehäuse drehfähig gelagert und der Antriebsmotor ist durch teilweise am Gehäuse und teilweise am Umfang des Lüfterlaufrades angeordnete Antriebskomponenten gebildet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 3/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 25/06 (2006.01); F04D 29/42 (2006.01); F24F 3/16 (2006.01); F24F 7/007 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 7/007 (2013.01); F04D 25/066 (2013.01); F04D 29/4213 (2013.01); F24F 3/161 (2013.01); F24F 13/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048904 A2 20001102; EP 1048904 A3 20050914; DE 19919796 A1 20001102

INPADOC legal status


2007-03-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2007-02-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060315

2006-05-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2005-09-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-09-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI