Global Patent Index - EP 1048910 A2

EP 1048910 A2 2000-11-02 - Method and device for a better use of the refrigerating power of a cryogenic stream

Title (en)

Method and device for a better use of the refrigerating power of a cryogenic stream

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur besseren Nutzung der Kälteenergie eines kyrogenen Stromes

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour une utilisation améliorée de la capacité frigorifique d'un écoulement cryogénique

Publication

EP 1048910 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00107589 A

Priority

DE 19919938 A

Abstract (en)

The conventional freezer room (9) has cold air extracted by a fan (6) in a duct (5) which is mixed with colder air in a duct from a liquid nitrogen cryogenic freezing unit (1) and delivered back to the freezing room by a larger fan (7).

Abstract (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur besseren Nutzung der Kälteenergie eines kryogenen Stromes, vorzugsweise eines Abluftgasstromes eines mit Flüssigstickstoff beschickten Tauchfrosters. Erfindungsgemäß wird der kryogene Strom (4) mit einem Kühlluftstrom (5), der eine höhere durchschnittliche Temperatur als der kryogene Strom (4) aufweist und der der Kühlung eines Raumes und/oder Gerätes (9) dient, vor dessen Zuführung in den Raum und/oder das Gerät (9) zusammengeführt. Hierzu mündet die (Abluft)Leitung des kryogenen Stromes (4) in die Leitung des Kühlluftstromes (5) und die Leitung des Kühlluftstromes (5) ist einem zu kühlenden Raum und/oder Gerät (9) zugeordnet. Der kryogene Strom (4) wird vorzugsweise von dem Kühlluftstrom (5) angesaugt. Der Kühlluftstrom (5) wiederum wird vorzugsweise in einem Kreislauf geführt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 3/10 (2006.01); F25D 3/11 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 3/102 (2013.01); F25D 3/11 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048910 A2 20001102; EP 1048910 A3 20001108; DE 19919938 A1 20001102

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031101

2003-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030704

2002-02-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINDE AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE GR IT

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010412

2000-12-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINDE GAS AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GR IT

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI