Global Patent Index - EP 1048910 A3

EP 1048910 A3 2000-11-08 - Method and device for a better use of the refrigerating power of a cryogenic stream

Title (en)

Method and device for a better use of the refrigerating power of a cryogenic stream

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur besseren Nutzung der Kälteenergie eines kyrogenen Stromes

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour une utilisation améliorée de la capacité frigorifique d'un écoulement cryogénique

Publication

EP 1048910 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00107589 A

Priority

DE 19919938 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1048910A2] The conventional freezer room (9) has cold air extracted by a fan (6) in a duct (5) which is mixed with colder air in a duct from a liquid nitrogen cryogenic freezing unit (1) and delivered back to the freezing room by a larger fan (7).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 3/10 (2006.01); F25D 3/11 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 3/102 (2013.01); F25D 3/11 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048910 A2 20001102; EP 1048910 A3 20001108; DE 19919938 A1 20001102

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031101

2003-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030704

2002-02-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINDE AG

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GR IT

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010412

2000-12-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINDE GAS AG

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GR IT

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI