Global Patent Index - EP 1048913 A1

EP 1048913 A1 2000-11-02 - Process for predrying textile yarns after wet treatment and apparatus for carrying out this process

Title (en)

Process for predrying textile yarns after wet treatment and apparatus for carrying out this process

Title (de)

Vortrocknungsverfahren für Textilfäden nach Nassbehandlung und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé de préséchage de fils textiles après traitement humide et dispositif pour la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé

Publication

EP 1048913 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00440116 A

Priority

FR 9905672 A

Abstract (en)

Pre-drying apparatus (1) comprises conveyor (4) supporting batt of yarn (3), draining mechanism (5) constantly applied on ya scrolling on conveyor, means (6) applying pressure difference by circulating air through batt of yarn, and housing (7) recoverin humidity and having conveyor on its top. An Independent claim is also included for the pre-drying method.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention a pour objet un dispositif et un procédé de préséchage de fils textiles après traitement humide. Dispositif caractérisé en ce qu'il est essentiellement constitué par un transporteur (4) de support de la nappe de fils (3), à surface de transport perméable, par un moyen mécanique d'essorage (5) s'appliquant en continu sur la nappe de fils (3) en défilement sur le transporteur de support (4), par un moyen (6) d'application d'une différence de pression par circulation d'air à travers ladite nappe (3) et par une enceinte (7) de récupération de l'humidité exprimée comportant à sa partie supérieure le transporteur de support (4). L'invention est plus particulièrement applicable dans le domaine de l'industrie textile, en particulier le traitement humide de fils textiles par lavage et/ou par teinture des fils. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F26B 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F26B 13/00 (2006.01); F26B 13/10 (2006.01); F26B 13/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 13/101 (2013.01); F26B 13/001 (2013.01); F26B 13/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048913 A1 20001102; EP 1048913 B1 20031015; DE 60005883 D1 20031120; DE 60005883 T2 20040909; FR 2792953 A1 20001103; FR 2792953 B1 20010622

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090425

2010-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090430

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080430

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091103

2010-01-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091231

2009-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SUPERBA S.A.S.

- Effective date: 20090430

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080421

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080513

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080411

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-11-12 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2004-11-12 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2004-10-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040716

2004-01-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SUPERBA (SOCIETE PAR ACTIONS SIMPLIFIEE)

2003-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60005883 P 20031120

2003-10-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *SUPERBA S.A.S.147 AVENUE ROBERT SCHUMAN, 68100 MU

- Effective date: 20031015

2003-10-31 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Owner name: *SUPERBA S.A.S.

- Effective date: 20031015

2003-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR IT

2003-04-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: APPARATUS FOR TREATING TEXTILE YARNS AND PROCESS USING THIS APPARATUS

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020620

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR IT

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010210

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR IT

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI