Global patent index - EP 1048919 A1

EP 1048919 A1 2000-11-02 - Fire weapon control system including safety means

Title (en)

Fire weapon control system including safety means

Title (de)

Feuerwaffensteuersystem mit Sicherheitsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Système de commande d'une arme à feu muni d'un dispostif de sécurité

Publication

EP 1048919 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99810350 A

Priority

EP 99810350 A

Abstract (en)

A fire weapon control system including safety means for preventing firing of the weapon by an unauthorized user. The system comprises a weapon having a weapon control means including a reader (23) lodged in a hollow part of the weapon handle (24), said reader comprising a transceiver composed of signal transmitter means and signal receiver means, the output of the receiver means being used to control the position of the safety means (27), which have a normally disarmed position and an armed position and which are adapted for being moved from the normally disarmed position to said armed position in response to a signal from the signal receiver means. The system further comprises a user identification element (15) adapted to be worn by a user of the weapon, said element having a transponder (14) adapted to receive a signal from said transmitter means, said transmitter means in the weapon being adapted to elicit a response from the transponder (14) of the user identification element (15). The transponder (14) of the user identification element (15) is adapted to receive a signal from said transmitter means in the weapon and to generate a transponder signal back to the weapon. The receiver means in the weapon have a recognition means responsive to at least one coded identification carried by the transponder signal, and a means for generating an output signal to operate said safety means (27) for release of the safety means to the armed position. In order to reduce the size, cost and energy consumption of the transceiver and in order to improve the performance and reliability of the weapon control system, the receiver means thereof have an amplitude shift keying demodulator (62) for demodulating the transponder signal sent to the weapon. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 17/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 17/063 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048919 A1 20001102; AT 278928 T 20041015; AU 3283000 A 20001110; DE 60014618 D1 20041111; DE 60014618 T2 20051117; EP 1171746 A1 20020116; EP 1171746 B1 20041006; WO 0065291 A1 20001102

INPADOC legal status

2002-05-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010503

2001-11-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-10-10 [D17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (DELETED)

- Ref Legal Event Code: D17P

2001-10-10 [DBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (DELETED)

- Ref Legal Event Code: DBV

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH LI

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010502

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH LI

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI