Global Patent Index - EP 1048921 A2

EP 1048921 A2 2000-11-02 - Method for coating the inner surface of a gun barrel

Title (en)

Method for coating the inner surface of a gun barrel

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Innenbeschichtung eines Waffenrohres

Title (fr)

Procédé pour le revêtement de la surface intérieure d'un tube de canon

Publication

EP 1048921 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00104757 A

Priority

DE 19919687 A

Abstract (en)

The coating method has at least part of the internal surface (9) of the weapon barrel (1) provided with a coating layer (17) a material which prevents corrosion, using a plasma coating process. An axially displaced burner (4) is inserted in the weapon bar for providing a plasma flame (8), into which the coating material is fed in the form of a powder, a wire or a band. The coating material is provided by niobium, molybdenum, tantalum, hafnium, chromium, vanadium, wolfram, zirconium, or an alloy of the latte

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Innenbeschichtung eines Waffenrohres, auf dessen innere Oberfläche (9) mindestens in einem Teilbereich (2) ein Schichtwerkstoff zur Vermeidung von Erosionen aufgebracht wird. Um auf einfache Weise hochschmelzende Schichtwerkstoffe auf die innere Oberfläche (9) des Waffenrohres (1) aufzubringen, schlägt die Erfindung vor, die Innenbeschichtung des jeweiligen Waffenrohres (1) durch Plasma-Auftragsschweißen vorzunehmen, wobei in dem Waffenrohr (1) ein Brenner (4) zum Erzeugen einer Plasmaflamme (8) angeordnet ist, welche sich bis zur inneren Oberfläche (9) des Waffenrohres (1) erstreckt und in welches der Schichtwerkstoff in pulver-, draht- oder bandförmiger Form eingebracht wird. In dem Plasma wird der Schichtwerkstoff aufgeschmolzen und das schmelzförmige Material an der inneren Oberfläche (9) des Waffenrohres (1) dann abgeschieden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 21/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 21/04 (2006.01); F41A 21/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 21/22 (2013.01); F41A 21/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048921 A2 20001102; EP 1048921 A3 20010822; DE 19919687 A1 20001102; US 2001051226 A1 20011213; US 6511710 B2 20030128

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-23 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-01-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031211

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-09-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010725

2001-08-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI