Global Patent Index - EP 1048922 A1

EP 1048922 A1 2000-11-02 - Fuze for the self-destruction of the ammunition

Title (en)

Fuze for the self-destruction of the ammunition

Title (de)

Selbstzerlegungseinrichtung für einen Munitionszünder

Title (fr)

Fusée pour l'autodestruction d'une munition

Publication

EP 1048922 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00108319 A

Priority

DE 19919000 A

Abstract (en)

The self-destruct device (1) has a slider (7) containing a detonator (35) for a munitions charge, displaced axially within a circular housing (3), a spring-loaded hammer (10) located in a recess at the end of the slider, which is held in a safety positi by a safety pin (46) and used for detonation of a delay charge (30-31) within the slider.

Abstract (de)

Ein Zünder (2) eines Bomblets besitzt eine pyrotechnische Selbstzerlegungseinrichtung (1). In einem axial bewegbaren Schieber (7) liegt ein pyrotechnischer Verzögerungssatz (30 bis 32). Zur Zündung des pyrotechnischen Verzögerungsatzes (30 bis 32) dient ein Anstichhammer (10). Der Anstichhammer (10) ist stirnseitig am Schieber (7) gelagert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42C 9/16; F42C 9/14; F42C 15/184

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42C 9/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42C 9/142 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4321941 A1 19950112 - JUNGHANS GMBH GEB [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048922 A1 20001102; EP 1048922 B1 20040303; DE 19919000 A1 20001109

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070415

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070415

2007-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070415

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-04-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060405

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-02-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-12-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-06-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040607

2004-06-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040622

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50005473

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-04-08

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-03-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021001

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI