Global Patent Index - EP 1048923 A1

EP 1048923 A1 2000-11-02 - Pyrotechnic fuze for the self-destruction of an ammunition

Title (en)

Pyrotechnic fuze for the self-destruction of an ammunition

Title (de)

Pyrotechnischer Selbszerleger für Munition

Title (fr)

Fusée pyrotechnique pour l'autodestruction d'une munition

Publication

EP 1048923 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00108320 A

Priority

DE 19919001 A

Abstract (en)

A pyrotechnic self-destruct device consists of a slide (7) moving in a longitudinal direction in a casing (3). This slide ha V-shaped pyrotechnic delay-action composition (29-32). A mechanical firing device (8) is fixed on the topside on the slide and designed as a swivelling tap hammer (10).

Abstract (de)

Ein pyrotechnischer Selbstzerleger (1) besteht aus einem, in einem Gehäuse (3, 14) in Längsrichtung bewegbaren Schieber (7) mit einem V-förmigen pyrotechnischen Verzögerungssatz (29 bis 32). Eine mechanische Zündvorrichtung (8) ist kopfseitig am Schieber (7) in Form eines schwenkbaren Anstichhammers (10) gelagert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42C 9/16; F42C 9/14; F42C 15/184

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42C 9/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42C 9/142 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4321941 A1 19950112 - JUNGHANS GMBH GEB [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048923 A1 20001102; EP 1048923 B1 20030716; DE 19919001 A1 20001109

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051230

2005-12-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051230

2005-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050415

2005-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-04-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050415

2005-04-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050415

2004-07-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040419

2004-06-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040622

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-05-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040329

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-03-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040309

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-11-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031029

2003-08-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50002889 P 20030821

2003-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-07-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI