Global Patent Index - EP 1048934 A2

EP 1048934 A2 2000-11-02 - Dual-wire-type detector

Title (en)

Dual-wire-type detector

Title (de)

Zweidrahtsensoreinrichtung

Title (fr)

Détecteur du type deux fils

Publication

EP 1048934 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00106483 A

Priority

DE 19919084 A

Abstract (en)

The sensor arrangement has a measurement sensor (S) with two connections for both measurement signal transfer and for simultaneous power supply. One end stage is connected to both connections to provide a voltage signal that is greater than a definable reference voltage signal and whose amplitude is a measure of the detected physical parameter.

Abstract (de)

Zweidrahtsensoren zur Messung physikalischer Größen haben nur zwei Anschlüsse (A1, A2), die sowohl der Stromversorgung als auch der Weiterleitung der Messsignale dienen. Weil Zweidrahtsensoren aber die Eigenschaften gesteuerter Stromquellen haben, können sie nur parallel geschaltet werden. Für eine Parallelschaltung aus n an unterschiedlichen Orten angeordneten Zweidrahtsensoren sind daher zwei n Leitungen erforderlich. Um die Anzahl der Leitungen zu reduzieren ist im Zweidrahtsensor eine Endstufe (W) vorgesehen, die eine Ausgangsspannung (UA) erzeugt, welche ein Maß für die von einem Messsensor (S) gemessenen pysikalischen Größe und stets größer als ein vorgebbares Referenzspannungssignal (Uref) ist. Weil der erfindungsgemäße Zweidrahtsensor deshalb die Eigenschaften einer Spannungsquelle hat, lassen sich mehrere in Serie schalten. Es sind daher auch bei einer Serienschaltung mehrerer Zweidrahtsensoren nur zwei Leitungen erforderlich. <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08C 19/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08C 19/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048934 A2 20001102; EP 1048934 A3 20031210; DE 19919084 A1 20001116; DE 19919084 C2 20010531; US 6437581 B1 20020820

INPADOC legal status


2010-03-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091001

2007-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070323

2004-09-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2004-08-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040602

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-12-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-12-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01D 21/02 A

2003-12-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04L 25/02 B

2003-12-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04B 3/54 B

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI