Global Patent Index - EP 1048935 A2

EP 1048935 A2 2000-11-02 - Flow sensor

Title (en)

Flow sensor

Title (de)

Strömungssensor

Title (fr)

Capteur d' écoulement

Publication

EP 1048935 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00108667 A

Priority

DE 29907566 U

Abstract (en)

The solid state gas flow sensor has an encapsulated construction with the inside of the cover fitted with two temperature sensors (18,20) and at least one electric heating element (18,20). The temperature sensors and the heating elements are applied to one s of a substrate, e.g. alumna, with the other side coated for a thermal contact with the inside of the sensor cover. The sensors/heaters are applied by brazing, adhesive or by shrink fitting to the inner surface of the cover. The heaters are applied the same substrate as the sensors, with a meandering, interdigitated design.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Strömungssensor mit einem Gehäuse, in dem zumindest zwei Temperaturfühler und zumindest ein Heizelement angeordnet sind. Die Erfindung ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß die beiden Temperaturfühler direkt an der Innenwandung des Gehäuses verlötet, verklebt oder auf die Innenwandung aufgeschrumpft sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01F 1/684

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01F 1/684 (2006.01); G01F 1/692 (2006.01); G01F 1/696 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01F 1/692 (2013.01); G01F 1/684 (2013.01); G01F 1/696 (2013.01); G01K 1/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29907566 U1 19990826; EP 1048935 A2 20001102; EP 1048935 A3 20010905

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020306

2002-06-27 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-09-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI