Global patent index - EP 1048945 A2

EP 1048945 A2 2000-11-02 - Method for determining anorganic components in a coating of a substrate

Title (en)

Method for determining anorganic components in a coating of a substrate

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Bestimmung anorganischer Bestandteile in einer Beschichtung eines Substrates

Title (fr)

Procédé pour déterminer les constituants inorganiques d'un revêtement d'un substrat

Publication

EP 1048945 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00107759 A

Priority

DE 19919499 A

Abstract (en)

A sample of the substrate with coating is treated in a closed chamber under reduced pressure, using ionized oxygen, until th coating no longer adheres firmly to the substrate. The coating released from the substrate is removed and its inorganic componen are determined. Preferred Features: To determine the end of treatment, the oxide content of the reaction gases leaving the chamber is monitored. To determine the inorganic components in the separated coating material, a wet chemical analysis process is employed. By measuri the difference in weight of the sample, with and without coating, the mass of the coating material is determined. Through reduce pressure, a stable ionized oxygen plasma is established. The reduced pressure is adjusted to about 2-20 hPa, treating the sample 10-40 minutes.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Bestimmung anorganischer Bestandteile, insbesondere Zinkpartikel, in einer organischen Matrix einer Beschichtung, die an einer anorganischen Oberfläche eines Substrates, insbesondere einem verzinkten Feinblech, fest haftet. Durch Behandlung einer beschichteten Probe des Substrates mit ionisiertem Sauerstoff bei Unterdruck wird die feste Haftung der Beschichtung vollständig aufgehoben, ohne daß dabei das Substrat selbst in Mitleidenschaft gezogen wird. Das Beschichtungsmaterial kann dann von der Oberfläche des Substrates entfernt und der Bestimmung seiner anorganischen Bestandteile mit üblichen Analysemethoden zugeführt werden.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 5/04 (2006.01); G01N 33/32 (2006.01); G01N 31/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/32 (2013.01); G01N 5/04 (2013.01); G01N 31/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048945 A2 20001102; EP 1048945 A3 20040102; DE 19919499 C1 20010201

INPADOC legal status

2005-05-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040703

2004-10-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2004-09-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2004-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-12-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 01N 17/00 A

2003-12-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 01N 33/32 B

2003-12-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 01N 21/71 B

2003-12-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 01N 5/04 B

2003-12-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 01N 31/12 B

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP STAHL AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-02-28 [K1C1] CORRECTION OF PATENT APPLICATION (TITLE PAGE) PUBLISHED

- Ref Legal Event Code: K1C1

- Effective date: 20001102

2001-02-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BRIXIUS, THOMAS

2001-02-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: STAHNKE, FRANK

2001-02-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MITTELSTAEDT, HORST, DR.

2001-02-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THYSSEN KRUPP STAHL AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-02-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BRIXIUS, THOMAS

2001-02-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BRIXIUS, THOMAS

2001-02-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: STAHNKE, FRANK

2001-02-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MITTELSTAEDT, HORST DR.

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI